Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:24-cv-01668
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:24 AM PDT
Consol Defendant
Accruent LLC
Represented By
Joseph Warren Swanson
Foley & Lardner Llp (tampa)
contact info
Peter Loh
Foley & Lardner Llp (dallas)
contact info
Ana Sofia Batista
Foley & Lardner Llp (dallas)
contact info
Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Todd T Williams
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Advanced Sterilization Products Inc
Represented By
Joseph Warren Swanson
Foley & Lardner Llp (tampa)
contact info
Peter Loh
Foley & Lardner Llp (dallas)
contact info
Ana Sofia Batista
Foley & Lardner Llp (dallas)
contact info
Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Todd T Williams
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Advanced Sterilization Products Services Inc
Represented By
Joseph Warren Swanson
Foley & Lardner Llp (tampa)
contact info
Peter Loh
Foley & Lardner Llp (dallas)
contact info
Ana Sofia Batista
Foley & Lardner Llp (dallas)
contact info
Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Todd T Williams
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Marilyn Cazares
Represented By
Grayson Wells
Stranch Jennings & Garvey Pllc (tn)
contact info
Samuel J Strauss
Strauss Borrelli PLLC
contact info
J Gerard Stranch, IV
Stranch Jennings & Garvey Pllc (tn)
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Seth Toepfer
Represented By
Grayson Wells
Stranch Jennings & Garvey Pllc (tn)
contact info
Samuel J Strauss
Strauss Borrelli PLLC
contact info
J Gerard Stranch, IV
Stranch Jennings & Garvey Pllc (tn)
contact info
Defendant
Fortive Corporation
Represented By
Joseph Warren Swanson
Foley & Lardner Llp (tampa)
contact info
Peter Loh
Foley & Lardner Llp (dallas)
contact info
Ana Sofia Batista
Foley & Lardner Llp (dallas)
contact info
Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Todd T Williams
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Dudley
Represented By
Juli E. Farris
Keller Rohrback Llp (wa)
contact info
Liberato P Verderame
Edelson Lechtzin LLP
contact info
Marc Howard Edelson
Edelson Lechtzin LLP
contact info
Samuel J Strauss
Strauss Borrelli PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherry Dudley
Represented By
Juli E. Farris
Keller Rohrback Llp (wa)
contact info
Liberato P Verderame
Edelson Lechtzin LLP
contact info
Marc Howard Edelson
Edelson Lechtzin LLP
contact info
Samuel J Strauss
Strauss Borrelli PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marilyn Cazares
Plaintiff
Jennifer Nelson
Plaintiff
Matthew Spaeth


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
33 33 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date Tue 04/15 9:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting32 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time re28 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to file a reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss is extended to 5/16/2025 and the motion is re-noted for 5/16/2025. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
32 32 motion Extension of Time-Other Mon 04/14 2:58 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time re28 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 4/14/2025, (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
31 31 33 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 03/31 2:51 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Matthew Spaeth, Jennifer Nelson, Marilyn Cazares, Michael Dudley, Sherry Dudley, Consol Plaintiffs Seth Toepfer, Marilyn Cazares, to28 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint . (Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
30 30 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/26 3:50 PM
ORDER re29 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph Warren Swanson for Defendants Fortive Corporation, Accruent LLC, Advanced Sterilization Products Inc, and Advanced Sterilization Products Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
29 29 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/25 3:34 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph W. Swanson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Defendants (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8856530 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
notice Notice-Other Tue 02/18 12:12 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The Court acknowledges the requirements of FRCP 16(b), but finds good cause to defer reinstating the initial case scheduling deadlines pending its ruling on Defendant's 7 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (VE)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
28 28 27 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 02/14 11:00 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 4/30/2025, (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
27 27 order Order on Stipulated Motion Fri 01/24 12:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. Finding good cause, the parties'26 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Pleadings Deadlines is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to 2/14/2025. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to a responsive pleading filed by the Defendants is extended from 30 days to 45 days. The deadline for Defendants to file a reply in support of a motion to dismiss is extended to 30 days from the date of Plaintiffs' filing a response to such a motion. (VE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
26 26 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 01/22 3:14 PM
Stipulated MOTION and (Proposed) Order to Extend Pleadings Deadlines , filed by Defendant Fortive Corporation. Noting Date 1/22/2025, (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
25 25 63 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/31 9:29 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against defendant(s) Accruent LLC, Advanced Sterilization Products Inc, Advanced Sterilization Products Services Inc, Fortive Corporation with JURY DEMAND Attorney Samuel J Strauss added to party Michael Dudley(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel J Strauss added to party Sherry Dudley(pty:pla) filed by Seth Toepfer, Sherry Dudley, Michael Dudley, Marilyn Cazares.(Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Sample Breach Notice
Monday, December 09, 2024
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/09 9:33 AM
***Deadlines terminated. The Court acknowledges the requirements of FRCP 16(b), but finds good cause to VACATE the deadlines contained in the18 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT pending the filing of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint and Defendants' Answer or responsive pleading. (VE)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
23 23 order 2 - Minute Order Fri 12/06 3:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER ON CASE NOS. CV24-1694-BJR AND CV24-01741-TL: These actions are reassigned to the Honorable Richard A. Jones because they are related to Case No. CV24-1668-RAJ. CV24-1668-RAJ is the lead case, and all future pleadings shall be filed using this case number ONLY. Accordingly, case number CV24-1694-BJR and case number CV24-01741-TL are to be CLOSED, and all future pleadings shall bear case number CV24-1668. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
24 24 order Consolidation Order - for Lead case only ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 12/06 4:28 PM
ORDER Granting19 Unopposed Joint Motion to Consolidate Related Cases And21 Unopposed Joint Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. The Dudley (2:24-cv-01668-RAJ), Toepfer (2:24-cv-1694), and Cazares (2:24-cv-01741-TL) actions shall be consolidated. All papers filed in the Consolidated Action shall be filed under Case No. 2:24-cv-01668-RAJ. The Court appoints J. Gerard Stranch, IV of Stranch, Jennings & Garvey, PLLC, Raina Borrelli of Strauss Borrelli, PLLC, Marc H. Edelson of Edelson Lechtzin, LLP, and Lynn A. Toops of Cohen & Malad, LLP as Interim Co-Lead and Class Counsel in the Consolidated Action. The Court sets the following briefing schedule following this Order: Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint no later than 30 days following the entry of this Order; Defendants shall file an Answer or responsive pleading 30 days following service of the Consolidated Complaint; Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendants' pleading 30 days thereafter; Defendants shall file any reply 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
22 22 misc Proposed Order (Unsigned) Wed 11/27 2:26 PM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re21 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Unopposed Joint Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel) ,19 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Unopposed Joint Motion to Consolidate Related Cases) (Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 11/27 2:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Unopposed Joint Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel) , filed by Plaintiffs Michael Dudley, Sherry Dudley. Noting Date 11/27/2024, (Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Edelson Resume),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (SJG Resume),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Strauss Borrelli Resume),
Att: 4 Exhibit D (Cohen & Malad Resume)
20 20 respm Declaration Wed 11/27 2:22 PM
DECLARATION of J. Gerard Stranch, IV filed by Plaintiffs Michael Dudley, Sherry Dudley re19 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Unopposed Joint Motion to Consolidate Related Cases) (Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 11/27 2:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Unopposed Joint Motion to Consolidate Related Cases) , filed by Plaintiffs Michael Dudley, Sherry Dudley. Noting Date 11/27/2024, (Strauss, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
18 18 order RAJ Joint Status Report Order (FORM) Wed 11/13 12:51 PM
ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/27/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/4/2024, Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2024, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc RAJ Standing Order (FORM) Wed 11/13 12:39 PM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
16 16 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/12 10:04 AM
ORDER re10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Peter Loh for Defendant Fortive Corporation, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 11/12 10:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AQ)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/12 9:56 AM
ORDER re11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ana Sofia Batista for Defendant Fortive Corporation, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/12 9:54 AM
ORDER re8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Marc Howard Edelson for Plaintiffs Michael Dudley, and Sherry Dudley, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
12 12 misc Consent Letter & Form Fri 11/08 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/15/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/08 11:51 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ana Sofia Batista FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fortive Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8711772 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/08 11:40 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter Loh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fortive Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8711736 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/08 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Blake Edward Marks-Dias on behalf of Defendant Fortive Corporation. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/08 8:59 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Marc H. Edelson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Michael Dudley, Sherry Dudley (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8711283 (Farris, Juli)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Fri 11/08 3:54 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice10 , Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice11 by attorney Peter Loh and Ana Sofia Batista will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact the Attorney Admissions Clerk at 206-370-8400 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Peter Loh and Ana Sofia Batista) (CDA)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Fri 11/08 3:57 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice8 by attorney Marc Edelson will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact the Attorney Admissions Clerk at 206-370-8400 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Marc Edelson) (CDA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
7 7 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/31 1:42 PM
ORDER re4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Liberato P Verderame for Plaintiff Michael Dudley, and Sherry Dudley, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
6 6 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Mon 10/28 3:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Fortive Corporation mailed on 10/23/2024 (Farris, Juli)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Praecipe to Attach Document Mon 10/28 3:52 PM
PRAECIPE to attach document Liberato P. Verderame Electronic Case Filing Agreement re4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application, by Plaintiffs Michael Dudley, Sherry Dudley (Farris, Juli)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Fri 10/25 11:47 AM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice4 by attorney Liberato Verderame will not be processed at this time. Page 4 (ECF registration form) is missing. Please file the missing page by using the Event Praecipe to Attach Document . Please contact Admissions Clerk at 206-370-8400 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Liberato Verderame) (CDA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
4 4 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/24 1:21 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Liberato P. Verderame FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Michael Dudley, Sherry Dudley (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8688201 (Farris, Juli)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 10/21 3:12 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Fortive Corporation. (RE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 10/21 3:05 PM
Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
2 2 misc Praecipe for a Summons Mon 10/14 11:00 AM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Michael Dudley, Sherry Dudley (Farris, Juli)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
1 1 42 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/11 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Fortive Corporation with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Juli E. Farris added to party Michael Dudley(pty:pla), Attorney Juli E. Farris added to party Sherry Dudley(pty:pla) filed by Michael Dudley, Sherry Dudley.(Farris, Juli)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8670820
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet