New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:24-cv-07757
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:706(a) Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Jessica F. Rosenbaum
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (chambers Street)
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Jessica F. Rosenbaum
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (chambers Street)
contact info
Plaintiff
Shan Rong Wang
Represented By
Gang Zhou
Law Office Of Gang Zhou, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
15 15 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/19 5:49 PM
STIPULATION ANDORDER OF DISMISSALIT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 11/19/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Tue 11/19 4:14 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Jessica F. Rosenbaum dated November 19, 2024 re: Requested Entry of Proposed Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/12 9:57 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica F. Rosenbaum on behalf of Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/29 11:44 AM
ORDER terminating11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court will hold Plaintiffs request in abeyance pending the Government's appearance and further developments. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 10/29/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 27, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/28 12:04 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to prospective response from the Defendants addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Gang Zhou, Esq. for Plaintff dated 10/27/2024. Document filed by Shan Rong Wang. Return Date set for 11/18/2024 at 12:00 AM..(Zhou, Gang)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
10 10 cmp Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus Tue 10/22 11:53 PM
SECOND COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.Document filed by Shan Rong Wang..(Zhou, Gang)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Tue 10/22 2:39 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gang Zhou to RE-FILE Document No. 9 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; The attached PDF reflects pleading title "Complaint". Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
9 9 cmp Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus Mon 10/21 3:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.Document filed by Shan Rong Wang..(Zhou, Gang)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 10/21 1:54 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gang Zhou to RE-FILE Document No. 7 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; Caption title contains a typo in the court name. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 19, 2024
8 8 service Certificate of Service Complaints Sat 10/19 2:42 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 10/18/2024, answer due 11/8/2024; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 10/18/2024, answer due 11/8/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Shan Rong Wang..(Zhou, Gang)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
7 7 cmp Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus Fri 10/18 2:08 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.Document filed by Shan Rong Wang..(Zhou, Gang)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 10/17 2:26 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 10/17 2:20 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gang Zhou to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/16 9:22 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, and Ur Mendoza Jaddou, re:4 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Shan Rong Wang..(Zhou, Gang)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus Wed 10/16 5:31 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.Document filed by Shan Rong Wang..(Zhou, Gang)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 10/15 11:37 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 10/15 11:38 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 10/15 11:38 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 10/15 11:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gang Zhou. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 10/15 11:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gang Zhou. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Tue 10/15 11:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gang Zhou to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/15 2:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gang Zhou to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name contains a typo;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/14 11:40 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, and Ur Mendoza Jaddou, re:1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Shan Rong Wang..(Zhou, Gang)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 10/14 11:37 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zhou, Gang)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus Fri 10/11 11:10 PM
FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30032765).Document filed by Shan Rong Wang..(Zhou, Gang)
Related: [-]