Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-05685
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Case in other court:New York Southern, 1:24-cv-07012
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
The 3M Company
Represented By
Jordan David Sagalowsky
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Represented By
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Plaintiff
Rodney Ryals
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Roosevelt Roberts
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Roberto Samper
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Russell
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Sanchez
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Rochford
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Richmond
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rickey Sartin
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosalind Robbins-Pettway
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Randy Rukse
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Randolph Robinson
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Philip Sardo
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paula Richards
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Rowe
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Saunders
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Myron Riley
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Romaine
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Venecio (Ben) Salazar
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Rowe
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Sean Sabatino
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Theresa Rollins
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Todd Rogers
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Terry Rosa
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Suzie Rich
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Sanders
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Samaniego
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Roy Roark
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Robichaud
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steve Russo
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steve Rogers
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Sandoval
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Savoy
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Salvatore Ruma
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Russell Roberts
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Sauve
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gail Roller
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward Salas
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eduardo Santos Jr.
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Edgar Sanchez
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Edgar Robinson
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Diana Marie Rushing
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Rutherford
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Sanderson
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Debora Rutherford
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gail Roth
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Richards
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Mikel Romero
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dan Rodriguez
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cleveland Ross
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charlene Roche
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brenda Rucker-Penland
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Satterwhite
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ariel Sada
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Romero
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joe Roberson
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Alfredo Rivera Alvarez
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Rollett
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Rivers
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kent Sanders
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Julie Salkeld
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Santos
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Rodarte
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Roth
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Robertson
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Rivera
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jimmie Richards-Jones
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremy Roman
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Janet Rodriguez
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ilya Rogers
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hiram Santoni
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Harry Sanders
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Rhodes
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerald Wayne Sasser
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerald Rogers
Represented By
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 22, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 11/22 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brenda Tracey, Jocelynn Schmalzer, Diana Marie Rushing, Edward Salas, Cheryl Badza, Michelle Carter, Mickey Gibson, Edward Johnson, Alfredo Murillo, Mathia Mutzhaus, Karyn Riggin, Manasseh Skinner, Jesse Thomas, Charles Williams, Robert Dixon, Chester Milburn, Robert James George Mcknight Ill, Taylor Mills, Michael Wandrei, Kirk Kinley, Raymond Jones, Rebecca Kelley, Vy Koy, Abigail Lehtinen, Ray Kruithof, Joseph Massaro, Thomas Lunsford, Kim Janas, Levi Gregory By Listed Plaintiffs Only, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 10/22 11:36 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
7 7 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 10/11 9:31 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:24-cv-07012, Gregory Rhodes et al v. The 3m Company et al., as DSC case 2:24-cv-05685-RMG (jbin)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 10/11 9:12 AM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-07012. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
4 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/8/2024) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.]
Related: [-]
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Jennifer H. Rearden is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.]
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.]
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
3 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by THE 3M COMPANY, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co...(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152271/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29901354).Document filed by THE 3M COMPANY, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co...(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint