Willie Johnson et al v. The 3M Company et al.
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-05695 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 7:24-cv-07000 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sanford Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Korter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Kinzel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Johnston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Kelley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirk Kinley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lovie Kabongo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Winston Judge Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maurice Kotmel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kroll
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kaufmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Konecne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristopher Kingan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Keener
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Joseph
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Kremer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Kolsch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Knox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Kelton Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vy Koy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Kandziorski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrence Knight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stevie King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven S Jones Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Koch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Kilpatrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Alan Kowalsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Josselson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Koho
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Kent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Kanash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edmund Klaus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earl Klinker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Joubert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Kottabi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Kierepka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Komor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana Khan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eryn Kahler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chiquita Jones Rawson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Arthur Johnston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cassandra King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cassandra Kenyon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Kirk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Calvin Kaiser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Kohring
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Kleyps
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Kristie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Knerr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Kaptein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine Kaminski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kalvin King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Keller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Kairis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Kazeck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Keith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jean Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Kelley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Kame
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gwendolyn Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Kopriva
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gayla Kreeger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Jorgenson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Leon Kirson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Farren Kenda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Estate Of Sandra Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Estate Of James Koizumi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, November 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brenda Tracey, Jocelynn Schmalzer, Diana Marie Rushing, Edward Salas, Cheryl Badza, Michelle Carter, Mickey Gibson, Edward Johnson, Alfredo Murillo, Mathia Mutzhaus, Karyn Riggin, Manasseh Skinner, Jesse Thomas, Charles Williams, Robert Dixon, Chester Milburn, Robert James George Mcknight Ill, Taylor Mills, Michael Wandrei, Kirk Kinley, Raymond Jones, Rebecca Kelley, Vy Koy, Abigail Lehtinen, Ray Kruithof, Joseph Massaro, Thomas Lunsford, Kim Janas, Levi Gregory By Listed Plaintiffs Only, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, October 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 10/11 11:33 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 7:24-cv-07000, Willie Johnson et al v. The 3M Company et al., as DSC case 2:24-cv-05695-RMG (jbin) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:24-cv-07000. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Lorna G. Schofield is no longer assigned to the case..(tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.] | ||
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Victoria L. Reznik to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Raymond Jones. The party was added to the case in error. (Duplicate Party) (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.] | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/11/2024.] | ||
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |