Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00212
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 2:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Dayana Amador (4)
Defendant
Brevin Pogue (2)
Represented By
Brian George O'Shea
Office Of The Federal Defender - Eastern District (frisco)
contact info
Sarah Ann Jacobs
Federal Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sean Jeffrey Taylor
Us Attorney'S Office - Sherman
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/21/2024 2:58 PM CDT
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
3 3 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Brevin Lee Pogue (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
Arrest (Rule 5c) of Brevin Lee Pogue (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
Arrest (Rule 5c) of Dayana Amador-Enamorado (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
11 11 5 pgs Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received After Arrest in Other District on TXED Charge as to Brevin Lee Pogue. The defendant was ordered detained, pending appearance before a TXED magistrate judge. (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
12 12 7 pgs Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received After Arrest in Other District on TXED Charge as to Dayana Amador-Enamorado. The defendant was ordered detained, pending appearance before a TXED magistrate judge. (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Brevin Lee Pogue: Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 9/30/2024 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. (mmc) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
13 13 E-GOV SEALED ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 9/12/2024 in case as to Brevin Lee Pogue. (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
14 14 E-GOV SEALED ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 9/12/2024 in case as to Dayana Amador-Enamorado. (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bill Davis: Status Conference as to Brevin Lee Pogue held on 9/30/2024 from 10:57 - 11:03 am. Attorney Sarah Ann Jacobs (FPD) standing by and appointed for Brevin Lee Pogue. Dft waived preliminary/detention hearings. Dft Location: Custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Chris Eason; Defense - Sarah Jacobs. No exhibits (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (knp) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
16 16 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Brevin Lee Pogue (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Brevin Lee Pogue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 9/30/2024. (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
18 18 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Brevin Lee Pogue (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs ORDER of Detention as to Brevin Lee Pogue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 9/30/2024. (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Brevin Lee Pogue (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER of Probable Cause in case as to Brevin Lee Pogue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 9/30/2024. (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs RULE 5(f)(1) ORDER as to Brevin Lee Pogue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 9/30/2024. (baf) [4:24-mj-00567-AGD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
25 25 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Brevin Lee Pogue (rpc)
Related: [-]
27 27 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Dayana Amador (rpc)
Related: [-]
32 32 9 pgs REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Brevin Lee Pogue, Dayana Amador. (rpc)
Related: [-]