Texas Western District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00301
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 2:25 AM CDT
Defendant
Nathan Lozano Torres (1)
Represented By
Bart Edward Medley
Law Office Of Bart Medley
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Scott Van Greenbaum
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Dec 19 2024
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Nathan Lozano Torres. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jl)
GPO Jan 22 2025
ORDER accepting re 34 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Nathan Lozano Torres. Guilty plea accepted REGARDING COUNT TWO OF THE SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jh1)

Docket last updated: 03/29/2025 12:56 AM CDT
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
Arrest of Nathan Lozano Torres (vs3) [4:24-mj-00463-DF]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND as to Nathan Lozano Torres by Judge David B. Fannin. (vs3) [4:24-mj-00463-DF]
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs COMPLAINT Signed by Judge David B. Fannin as to Nathan Lozano Torres. (vs3) [4:24-mj-00463-DF]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fannin:Initial Appearance as to Nathan Lozano Torres held on 9/30/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 10/3/2024 09:30 AM in Pecos before Judge David B. Fannin,) Oral Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Nathan Lozano Torres, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Nathan Lozano Torres (Court Reporter FTR ALPINE.) (vs3) [4:24-mj-00463-DF]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (vs3) [4:24-mj-00463-DF]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY/DETENTION HEARING as to Nathan Lozano Torres. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (vs3) [4:24-mj-00463-DF]
Related: [-]
5 5 Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Nathan Lozano Torres. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (vs3) [4:24-mj-00463-DF]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Nathan Lozano Torres. (vs3) [4:24-mj-00463-DF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fannin:Preliminary Hearing as to Nathan Lozano Torres held on 10/3/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Detention Hearing as to Nathan Lozano Torres held on 10/3/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Nathan Lozano Torres (Court Reporter FTR-PECOS.) (jh1) [4:24-mj-00463-DF]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to No Bond as to Nathan Lozano Torres (1). Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00463-DF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
All parties shall comply with the[LINK:StandingOrders] for the Pecos Division. Parties can review the standing orders by clicking the included hyperlink as to Nathan Lozano Torres (jl)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Nathan Lozano Torres (1) count(s) 1, 2. (jl)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Nathan Lozano Torres (jl)
Related: [-]