Colorado District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00281
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 1:26 AM MDT
Defendant
Cory James McIlveen (1)
Represented By
Patrick Francis Welsh
Welsh Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mark Ted Romley
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Peter Grattan Hautzinger
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 5:08 PM MDT
Thursday, September 12, 2024
1 1 7 pgs INDICTMENT as to Cory James McIlveen (1) count(s) 1-10. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Information Sheet
2 2 Summons Issued as to Cory James McIlveen. Initial Appearance set for 10/8/2024 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before District Judge Gordon P Gallagher. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]