Georgia Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00033
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Ismael Delgado-Celis (1)
Represented By
Adrienne Blair Browning
Tucker & Browning
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ryan Bondura
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/13/2024 3:56 AM EDT
Friday, September 13, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Ismael Delgado-Celis. Attorney Adrienne Blair Browning for Ismael Delgado-Celis added. (KM)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Ismael Delgado-Celis. Initial Appearance set for 9/17/2024 10:30 AM in Brunswick - Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Interpreter Michelle Gonzales is appointed at a rate of $190/$350 for one full day and approved to travel via POV pursuant to the contract. (KM)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ismael Delgado-Celis (1). (pts)
Related: [-]
3 3 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Ismael Delgado-Celis for September 17, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on September 13, 2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ORDER for Appointment of Attorney as to Ismael Delgado-Celis. Adrienne Blair Browning is appointed to serve as attorney for Defendant Ismael Delgado-Celis in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/13/2024. (km)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice of Counsel's Post-Conviction Obligation Requirements as to Defendant Ismael Delgado-Celis. (KM)
Related: [-]