Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Sara L Ellis
Case #: 1:24-cv-10037
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 5:02 AM CDT
Defendant
Patio Restaurant of Bolingbrook, Inc.
Represented By
Jamie L Filipovic
O'Hagan Meyer, LLC
contact info
Adi Kanlic
O'Hagan Meyer, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lois White
Represented By
Angela C. Spears
Cass Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/14/2024 12:20 AM CDT
Saturday, October 12, 2024
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Lois White; No. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22595759.(Spears, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet