District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00458
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2024 3:20 AM EDT
Defendant
JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO (1)
Represented By
Benjamin Mark Schiffelbein
Federal Public Defender For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Samuel White
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Jan 23 2025
MEMORANDUM & ORDER as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART the government's 24 Motion to Dismiss Case. See Memorandum & Order for further details. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 23, 2025. (lcbah4)

Docket last updated: 10/14/2024 3:28 AM EDT
Thursday, August 29, 2024
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO (1). (zstd) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redacted Statement of Facts
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO.(zstd) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on 8/29/2024. (zstd) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
Arrest of JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO in North Carolina. (zljn) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO (zljn) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant, dated 08/29/2024, Returned Executed on 09/12/2024 as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO. (zljn) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
MINUTE ORDER as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant appear for an initial appearance on 9/19/2024 at 12:30 p.m. EST before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference; call-in instructions will be provided to counsel prior to the hearing. Counsel for the United States is directed to ensure that counsel for Defendant has received this Order and will provide the information to Defendant. If Defendant does not have counsel, counsel for the United States is directed to contact the Office of the Federal Public Defender for the District of Columbia and provide their office with the information contained in this Order. If the parties have questions about this Order or the scheduled hearing, please contact the Courtroom Deputy at 202-354-3102. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/17/2024. (znjb) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Benjamin Mark Schiffelbein appearing for JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO (Schiffelbein, Benjamin) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
7 7 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Authorize Disclosure of 6(e) and Sealed Materials by USA as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO. (White, Samuel) Modified event on 9/18/2024 (znmw). [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
8 8 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO. (White, Samuel) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
10 10 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO from United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina Case Number 7:24-mj-01209 (zljn) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO. (zltp) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO. (zltp) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: First Appearance in the District as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO held on 9/19/2024. The Court advised the Government of its Due Process Obligations under Rule 5(f). Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO (1); heard and granted. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO (1); heard and granted. Speedy Trial Excluded from 9/19/2024 to 11/5/2024 in the Interest of Justice (XT). Defendant waives his right to a Preliminary Hearing. Status Hearing set for 11/5/2024 at 1:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant remain on Personal Recognizance; Court Reporter: FTR-GOLD; FTR Time Frame: CTRM 6: [2:09:32 - 2:22:59]; Defense Attorney: Benjamin Schiffelbein; US Attorney: Fred Yette for Samuel White; Pretrial Officer: Christopher Tynes. (zltp) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO (1) Personal Recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/19/2024. (zltp) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appearance Bond
Friday, September 20, 2024
12 12 ORDER granting8 Motion for Protective Order Governing Discovery as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/20/2024. (znjb) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
MINUTE ORDER as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO (1) GRANTING the government's unopposed7 Motion for an Order to Disclose Items Protected by Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 6(e) and Sealed Materials and AUTHORIZING the government, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 6(e)(3)(E)(i) and the previously entered12 Protective Order governing discovery in this case, to provide to defendant, and any co-defendants who may later be joined, materials protected by Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 6(e), insofar as such disclosure is necessary for the government to comply with its discovery and disclosure obligations. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/23/2024. (znbn) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING (CHANGE OF DATE) as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINOStatus Hearing moved to 11/7/2024 at 1:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. (zltp) [1:24-mj-00278-MAU]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
MINUTE ORDER as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO: Arraignment set for 10/24/2024 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 26A- In Person before Judge Beryl A. Howell. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 10/11/24. (mac)
Related: [-]
15 15 INFORMATION as to JUSTINA NICOLE GUARDINO (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (zstd)
Related: [-]