Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-20455
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2024 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Elvis Alexander Cambizaca-Pelaez (1)
Represented By
Micki Bloom
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Noticing FPD-MIA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nicholas Carre
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/14/2024 3:24 AM EDT
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
Arrest of Elvis Alexander Cambizaca-Pelaez (yeh0) [1:24-mj-04099-LMR]
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs COMPLAINT as to Elvis Alexander Cambizaca-Pelaez (1). (fbn) [1:24-mj-04099-LMR]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid: Initial Appearance as to Elvis Alexander Cambizaca-Pelaez held on 10/1/2024. Bond set: Stipulated to Pretrial Detention with the right to revisit. Preliminary Examination/Arraignment set for 10/15/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Spanish Interpreter present. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-MIA for Elvis Alexander Cambizaca-Pelaez (Digital 13:47:40/14:08:27) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 10/1/2024. (yeh0) [1:24-mj-04099-LMR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Micki Bloom appearing for Elvis Alexander Cambizaca-Pelaez . Attorney Micki Bloom added to party Elvis Alexander Cambizaca-Pelaez(pty:dft). (Bloom, Micki) [1:24-mj-04099-LMR]
Related: [-]
4 4 Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by Elvis Alexander Cambizaca-Pelaez (Bloom, Micki) [1:24-mj-04099-LMR]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
5 5 INFORMATION as to Elvis Alexander Cambizaca-Pelaez (1) count(s) 1. (fbn)
Related: [-]