New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:24-cv-07769
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2024
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc.
1440 Broadway 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10018
Defendant
Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc.
9255 Sunset Boulevard 2nd Floor
West Hollywood, CA 90069
Defendant
Bad Boy Entertainment LLC
Defendant
Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc.
9255 Sunset Boulevard 2nd Floor
West Hollywood, CA 90069
Defendant
Bad Boy Productions LLC
Defendant
Bad Boy Records LLC
Defendant
CE OPCO, LLC
9255 Sunset Boulevard 2nd Floor
West Hollywood, CA 90069
Defendant
Sean Combs
37452-054 BROOKLYN METROPOLITAN DETENTION CENTER Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 329002
BROOKLYN, NY 11232
Defendant
Daddy's House Records, Inc.
1710 Broadway
New York, NY 10019
Defendant
Mariott International, Inc.
7750 Wisconsin Avenue
Bethesda, MA 20814
Defendant
Organizational Does 1-10
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Curis Law PLLC 52 Duane St 7th Floor
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Antigone Curis
Merson Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 10/15 4:34 PM
ORDER Plaintiff initiated this action by filing a Complaint on October 14, 2024. Plaintiff appears to seek to proceed under a pseudonym, as the Complaint identifies Plaintiff as "Jane Doe." Pursuant to Rule 6.14(b) of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions, such a proceeding must be commenced as a miscellaneous case with leave from the Court to proceed using a pseudonym. It is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed for failure to comply with ECF Rule 6.14(b). Plaintiff may commence a new action in accordance with that rule. Plaintiff is referred to the ECF Help Desk and/or the Clerks Office for procedural assistance in commencing the action. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 10/15/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 10/15 10:12 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Antigone Curis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CE OPCO, LLC . The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (gp) Modified on 10/15/2024 (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/15 10:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Antigone Curis to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Citizenship of Principle Parties section on the PDF has multiple selections for the Defendant. Place an X in Citizenship of Principle Parties box for the Defendant and refile. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 10/15 10:25 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 10/15 10:25 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 10/15 10:26 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Antigone Curis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CE OPCO, LLC . The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (gp) Modified on 10/15/2024 (gp).
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
12 12 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/14 3:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marriott International, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/14 3:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Productions LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/14 3:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Entertainment LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/14 3:05 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Records LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/14 3:04 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/14 3:03 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/14 3:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/14 3:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CE Opco, LLC dba Combs Global fka Combs Enterprises LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/14 3:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daddy's House Recordings Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/14 2:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean Combs, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 10/14 1:05 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curis, Antigone) Modified on 10/15/2024 (gp).
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/14 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT against Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Entertainment LLC, Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Productions LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, CE OPCO, LLC, Sean Combs, Daddy's House Records, Inc., Mariott International, Inc., Organizational Does 1-10. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30034626)Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]