New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Diane Gujarati
Referred: Marcia M Henry
Case #: 1:24-cv-07200
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 5:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Blima Druker
Represented By
Andrew Ryan Heighington
Book Law LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hasc Center Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Ryan Heighington
Book Law LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark Shmulie Schwartz
Represented By
Andrew Ryan Heighington
Book Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eliyezer Takhalov
Represented By
Nicole Brenecki
Jodre Brenecki, LLP
contact info
Jordan Adam Jodre
Jodre Brenecki, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 05/16 2:29 PM
ORDER granting 15 : Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file his motion for settlement approval is granted. By 05/23/2025 , Plaintiff shall move for settlement approval including the necessary documents pursuant to the Court's 04/17/2025 Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 05/16/2025. (YHW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 05/15 4:26 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Cheeks Motion by Eliyezer Takhalov. (Brenecki, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
order Order(Other) Thu 04/17 11:20 AM
ORDER re Status Report14 : The parties report having reached a settlement in principle. Accordingly, by 05/16/2025 , the parties shall file their motion for settlement agreement pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015). The Cheeks motion shall include (1) a fully executed copy of the proposed settlement agreement, and any translated copies of the agreement, if applicable; (2) a letter brief (of seven pages or fewer) that includes a fulsome analysis of the factors set forth in Wolinsky v. Scholastic Inc. , 900 F. Supp. 2d 332, 335-36 (S.D.N.Y. 2012), and related cases; (3) an explanation of and documents related to Plaintiff's damages calculations; and (4) if attorneys' fees and costs are included in the settlement, time and billing records and receipts for Plaintiff's counsel and copies of any relevant retainer agreements, if applicable. Counsel may consider whether they will file a form consenting to the undersigned Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction for review of the settlement agreement and to conduct a Cheeks hearing, if needed. Either party or both parties may withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 04/17/2025. (YHW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Tue 04/15 1:53 PM
Letter by Blima Druker, Hasc Center Inc., Mark Shmulie Schwartz (Heighington, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
order Order(Other) Fri 04/11 10:51 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: By 04/21/2025, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the outcome of their mediation scheduled for 03/25/2025 ( See ECF No. 13) and their intended next steps for this action. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 04/11/2025. (YHW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Tue 01/28 11:45 AM
Letter Joint Status Report by Hasc Center Inc., Blima Druker, Mark Shmulie Schwartz (Heighington, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/28 11:42 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Heighington, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 01/13 9:58 AM
ORDER denying 11 : The parties report that they have agreed to pursue mediation and therefore request to stay all deadlines in this action, including the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint during the pendency of mediation. The application is denied because mediation and answering the Complaint are not mutually exclusive. Therefore, the Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 01/31/2025 . By the same date, the parties shall file a joint status report (not to exceed two pages) either identifying their chosen mediator and the date of the mediation or advising the Court that the case has settled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 01/13/2025. (YHW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
11 11 motion Stay Thu 01/09 12:04 PM
First MOTION to Stay by Hasc Center Inc., Blima Druker, Mark Shmulie Schwartz. (Heighington, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/06 4:33 PM
ORDER granting 10 : The deadline for Defendants HASC Center, Inc., Blima Druker, and Mark Shmulie Schwartz to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 01/15/2025 . Further extensions are unlikely. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 12/06/2024. (YHW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/04 12:12 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hasc Center Inc., Blima Druker, Mark Shmulie Schwartz. (Heighington, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/08 12:16 PM
ORDER granting 9 : The deadline for Defendants Hasc Center Inc., Blima Druker, and Mark Shmulie Schwartz to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 12/06/2024 , on consent. Parties shall consult the presiding district judge's individual rules before filing dispositive motions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 11/08/2024. (YHW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 11/07 5:15 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hasc Center Inc., Blima Druker, Mark Shmulie Schwartz. (Heighington, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/07 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ryan Heighington on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Heighington, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/15 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Adam Jodre on behalf of Eliyezer Takhalov (aty to be noticed) (Jodre, Jordan)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 10/15 10:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Blima Druker, Hasc Center Inc., Mark Shmulie Schwartz. (KD)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 10/15 10:35 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 10/15 10:34 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/15 10:33 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 10/14 1:10 PM
Proposed Summons. by Eliyezer Takhalov (Brenecki, Nicole)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 10/14 1:07 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Eliyezer Takhalov (Brenecki, Nicole)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/14 12:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Blima Druker, Hasc Center Inc., Mark Shmulie Schwartz filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18383008 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Eliyezer Takhalov. (Brenecki, Nicole)
Related: [-]