Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Keith P Ellison
Case #: 4:24-cv-03918
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Case in other court:Texas Eastern, 2:24-cv-00517
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 5:29 AM CDT
Conflict Check Party
Assurant, Inc
Defendant
American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc.
Represented By
Carter Babaz
Alston & Bird
contact info
Elliott Richard Charles Riches
Alston & Bird
contact info
Keith Edward Broyles
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Elliott C. Riches
Alston & Bird
contact info
Plaintiff
Torus Ventures LLC
Represented By
Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Rabicoff Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/14/2024 2:41 PM CDT
Thursday, July 11, 2024
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (CH)
Related: [-]
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CH)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10232693.), filed by Torus Ventures LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of Torus Ventures LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
3 3 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Torus Ventures LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
5 5 SUMMONS Issued as to American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc.. (CH)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc. to 9/5/2024. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(CH)
Related: [-]
6 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc..(Broyles, Keith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc. to 9/20/2024. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(NKL)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Edward Broyles on behalf of American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc. (Broyles, Keith)
Related: [-]
8 8 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc..(Broyles, Keith)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carter Babaz on behalf of American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc. (Babaz, Carter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
10 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc..(Broyles, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
11 11 ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc. answer due 10/4/2024. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/18/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
12 12 JOINT MOTION to Change Venue and for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by American Financial & Automotive Services, Inc..(Broyles, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
Interdistrict transfer to the Southern District of Texas Houston Division. (KLC)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The Court ORDERS that the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended up to and including November 4, 2024.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/08/2024. (KLC)
Related: [-]
14 14 Order granting12 Joint Motion to Transfer. The Court ORDERS that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/08/2024. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Christina A. Bryan randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (bkt4)
Related: [-]
15 15 Case transferred in from Texas Eastern. Case Number 2:24-cv-00517; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
Related: [-]
16 16 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (bkt4)
Related: [-]