Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:C Ashley Royal
Case #: 5:24-cv-00356
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 5:39 AM EDT
Defendant
B&G EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC
135 Region South Drive
Jackson, GA 30233
Represented By
ALEXANDRA M DISHUN
One Atlantic Center
contact info
JAMIE KONN
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK BEECHAM
Represented By
MARISSA TORGERSON
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 06, 2025
8 8 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Thu 02/06 4:17 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 8/5/2025. Dispositive motions due by 9/4/2025. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 02/06/2025. (bsl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/05 11:28 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ALEXANDRA M DISHUN on behalf of B&G EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC Attorney ALEXANDRA M DISHUN added to party B&G EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC(pty:dft)(DISHUN, ALEXANDRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
6 6 5 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Tue 01/07 9:18 AM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/6/2025. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 1/7/2025.(bsl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Required Form
Monday, December 30, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/30 4:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by B&G EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC identifying Other Affiliate PELSIS NORTH AMERICA, LTD. for B&G EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC. (KONN, JAMIE)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/30 3:58 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by B&G EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC.(KONN, JAMIE)Attorney JAMIE KONN added to party B&G EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/31 11:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARK BEECHAM as to B&G EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC. (TORGERSON, MARISSA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 10/15 11:54 AM
Summons Issued as to B&G EQUIPMENT SUPPLY INC. (elp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
1 1 misc Complaint Mon 10/14 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT against B & G EQUIPMENT SUPPLY, INC. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4771287, $405 filed by MARK BEECHAM(TORGERSON, MARISSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Ex. 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Ex.2 Summons-B&G Equipment Supply