Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Bridget Meehan Brennan
Case #: 1:24-cv-01784
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2024
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 6:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Hopebridge, LLC
Represented By
William D. Edwards
Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Indianapolis
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Clarke
Represented By
Frederick M. Bean
Spitz Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Judgment Tue 04/22 1:58 PM
Order of Case Dismissal: On April 18, 2025, counsel for both parties jointly notified the Court of their settlement agreement in this matter. At the request of both parties, the matter is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The parties have thirty (30) days from this Order in which to file a Notice of Dismissal with prejudice which, if approved, shall supersede this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/22/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
15 15 9 pgs oth_ans Answer Mon 03/31 1:52 PM
First Amended Answer to1 Complaint for Damages and Reinstatement filed by Hopebridge, LLC. (Edwards, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
order Order on Motion for leave Mon 03/24 1:52 PM
Order [non-document] GRANTING unopposed motion for leave to file first amended answer. (Doc.14 .) Defendant Hopebridge, LLC shall file its amended answer within five (5) business days of this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 3/24/25.(T,A)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
14 14 motion Leave Fri 03/21 9:11 AM
Motion for leave (Unopposed) to File First Amended Answer filed by Defendant Hopebridge, LLC.(Edwards, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- EEOC FOIA Confirmation Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - EEOC FOIA Documents,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint
Friday, February 28, 2025
13 13 order Magistrate Judges Initial Order Fri 02/28 4:36 PM
Mediation Scheduling Order setting mediation conference to be held on 04/28/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements prior to the mediation conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 02/28/2025. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Protective Order Fri 02/28 11:16 AM
Protective Order . Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 2/28/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
11 11 notice Stipulation (atty event) Thu 02/27 4:12 PM
Proposed Stipulation Stipulated Protective Order filed by Ashley Clarke. (Bean, Frederick)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Thu 02/27 1:11 PM
Case Management Conference Order: The parties are instructed to read the attached Order in its entirety. Case is assigned to the standard track. The following deadlines have been established: Amended pleadings/joinder of parties: 3/21/2025 ; non-expert discovery: 8/1/2025 ; dispositive motions: 9/19/2025. A telephonic Status Conference is set for 6/26/2025 at 9:00 a.m. EST. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of email of the telephone number for the conference. The parties shall dial into the Court's bridge line at least five minutes prior to the conference. During the status conference, the Court will set additional deadlines for expert discovery. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 2/27/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Thu 02/27 1:03 PM
Minute Order [non-document]: A telephonic Case Management Conference was held on 2/27/2025 before Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan. Attorney Frederick Bean participated on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney William Edwards participated on behalf of Defendant. The parties discussed early mediation efforts and reported to the Court mediation after initial discovery may be productive. Therefore, this case is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for mediation to occur as soon as practicable after 4/16/2025. The parties did not agree to consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. The parties agreed to use the protocol in Appendix K to the Local Rules for electronically stored information. The parties agreed to use the form protective order in Appendix L to the Local Rules and submit a proposed protective order on or before 2/27/2025. The Court then established deadlines as stated in the Court's Case Management Conference Order. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 2/27/25. (Court reporter: None) Time: 10 minutes (T,A)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
9 9 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Fri 02/14 3:06 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed R. Civ. P. 26(f) and L.R. 16.3(b)(3) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Ashley Clarke. (Bean, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
8 8 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Tue 01/21 10:16 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: A telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of email of the telephone number for the conference. The parties shall dial into the Court's bridge line at least five minutes prior to hearing. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 1/21/25.(T,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report,
Att: 2 Letter from Chief Judge Lioi,
Att: 3 Magistrate Consent Form,
Att: 4 Standard for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information,
Att: 5 Rule 30.1
Friday, January 17, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/17 1:35 PM
Defendant Hopebridge LLC's Answer to1 Complaint, filed by Hopebridge, LLC. (Edwards, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Fri 12/27 2:06 PM
Order [non-document] granting unopposed motion for extension of time until January 20, 2025 to answer Plaintiff's complaint. (Doc.5 .) IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 12/27/24.(T,A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
6 6 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Thu 12/19 3:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hopebridge, LLC. (Edwards, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension (answer complaint) Thu 12/19 3:00 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 20,2025 to answer plaintiff's complaint filed by Defendant Hopebridge, LLC. Related document(s)1 . (Edwards, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Thu 11/07 3:24 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Hopebridge, LLC c/o Registered Agent URS Agents Inc. on 11/4/2024, filed on behalf of Ashley Clarke. Date verified with U.S. Postal Service Website. Related document(s)2 . (C,RD)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
oth_evt Service by Clerk Mon 10/28 10:33 AM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to the following: Hopebridge, LLC c/o Registered Agent URS Agents Inc., Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 1211 5498 59 and Hopebridge, LLC dba Hopebridge Autism Therapy Center, Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 1211 5498 42. Placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. (C,RD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
3 3 order Initial Order - Judge Brennan Wed 10/16 10:36 AM
Initial Standing Order signed by Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 10/16/24. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 10/15 9:24 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Hopebridge, LLC. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 10/15 9:15 AM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 10/15 9:15 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/14 4:47 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Hopebridge, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12782846.. Filed by Ashley Clarke. (Bean, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 4 pgs Summons