California Northern District Court
Judge:Eumi K Lee
Case #: 3:24-cv-07150
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2024
Case in other court:Santa Clara Superior Court, 24CV444183
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 3:55 AM PDT
Cross-claimant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By
Arlen Litman-Cleper
Cesari Werner & Moriarty
contact info
Sean P. Moriarty
Cesari, Werner & Moriarty
contact info
Cross-defendant
Slendertone Distribution, Inc.
Defendant
Bio-Medical Research Ltd.
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By
Arlen Litman-Cleper
Cesari Werner & Moriarty
contact info
Sean P. Moriarty
Cesari, Werner & Moriarty
contact info
Defendant
Slendertone Distribution, Inc.
Plaintiff
David Corey
Represented By
Jeffrey Ryan Smith
Abramson Smith Waldsmith, LLP
contact info
Robert John Waldsmith
Abramson Smith Waldsmith, LLP
contact info
William Benjamin Smith
Abramson Smith Waldsmith, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Corey
Represented By
Jeffrey Ryan Smith
Abramson Smith Waldsmith, LLP
contact info
Robert John Waldsmith
Abramson Smith Waldsmith, LLP
contact info
William Benjamin Smith
Abramson Smith Waldsmith, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 10/15 10:08 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 10/14 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV444183. (Filing fee $405 receipt number CCANDC-19947947). Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Litman-Cleper, Arlen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B