Thind v. Healthfirst, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah Netburn |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-09539 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:206 FLSA: Minimum Wage |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 29, 2016 12:25 PM EDT |
Defendant
HF Management Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Healthfirst PHSP, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Healthfirst, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kanwarpreet Thind
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ada Wan Ying Cheung
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvette Acevedo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mariela Adames
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kokou E. Ahonwoto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dacia Ahorrio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iliana Albelo Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Celenita Alicea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arlina Almonte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vilma Alvarenga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lylla Alvarez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Alvizuri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adzo Amela
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pascal Amoah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Aviles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hanif A. Aziz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Loury Azucena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alex Bastidas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rafael Batista
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise Belle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iraida Bessom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelvin Blanco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luisa Brache
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Burgos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shatina Burns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Cabezas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aiba Caicedo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elena Caraballo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wang Chen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wei Chen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Chew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kacheong Chu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Esmeralda Cintron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jermaine Coles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dinora H. Collazo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Confesor Concepcion
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Magaly Correa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arllen Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol J Dammann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Damour
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gehu Dezius
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Musu Drammeh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanna Drozd-Hammoudi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liliana Echeverria
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ana Escalante
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nurys Escano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yasmiri Espejo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Olgarina Espinal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Viviana Espinal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miriam Estrada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ibukun Falola
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mabud Farhana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ferdi Ferrufino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martina Figueroa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judith Fiorucci
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvette Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesus Forti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Foster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sam Gao
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anna Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisabel Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Javier Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yohanna Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cai Guo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pearl Hale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Hannam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natasha Hector
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Desiree Higgins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Izzolo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin R Jeffrers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Satinder Kalir
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rubina Khanam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wisscard Lafosse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ojami Lahoz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jin Li
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Lieberman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abe Sunny Lin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yanzhen Lin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela V. Loor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kayode Lott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ira Lucas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leandra Luna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edith Majano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hovadis Maracallo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Marescot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Maxwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suzie Mayas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aurora Medina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Millan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reyes M Mojica
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeannette Monter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johanny Montero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria P. Moran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Olaitan Oke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yavgeniy Olhovsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johanna Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juana Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yamaira Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angelica Otero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jocelin A Pantoja
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Pena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keisy Pena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guillermina Peralta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Torye Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yary Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ybelisetz Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonia Polanco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allesca Pratt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia Puma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Khadine E. Rajrumar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
McKay Rambardan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Malisha Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Belky Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwina Rios
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damaris Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stefanie Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Veronica Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carmen Rojas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Rosario
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Rubio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milvy Sam-Stickell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Giovanna Santos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carmen Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xian Song
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Stanford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Terrero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marisol Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oyenuwa O. Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dahlia Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blanca Vasques-Cuzco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricelly Veloz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcia Veras
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milka Viscaino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shen Wayne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hing Xue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lian Ye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ebenezer Yeboah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hui Yu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tahsin Zakaria
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yue Hui Zhang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kent Zhao
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aura Zorrilla
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Bin Yang
Terminated: 07/27/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reisy Pena
Terminated: 03/02/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |