New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Referred: Robert W Lehrburger
Case #: 1:24-cv-07790
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2024
Terminated:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 6:33 AM EDT
Defendant
The Fresh Air Fund
Represented By
Diane Windholz
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Olivia Hines
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Fields
Represented By
Jillian Tattersall
Ballon Stoll
contact info
Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Ballon Stoll P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 05/05 11:26 AM
ORDER: It has been reported to the Court that the parties in this case have reached a settlement agreement. (See Doc. 19.) Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/5/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
19 19 misc Status Report Mon 04/28 11:16 AM
STATUS REPORT. (Joint Status Report) Document filed by The Fresh Air Fund..(Windholz, Diane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 03/25 9:51 AM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Mon 03/03 11:55 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 02/25/2025 was not held. Mediation Status due by 3/18/2025.(sni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/28 11:50 AM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2025. Deposition due by 7/31/2025. Fact Discovery due by 7/31/2025. All parties do not consent to a trial before a Magistrate Judge at this time. This case is to be tried to a jury. The parties anticipate that the trial of this case will require 5 days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 1/28/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 01/28 11:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/28/2025 at 9:30 a.m. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 01/15 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2025 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The conference will be held telephonically. The parties are instructed to call (646) 453-4442 and enter access code 940338486#. Counsel shall jointly complete and file Judge Lehrburger's [Proposed] Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which must be submitted in compliance with Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices no later than one week before the initial case management conference. If suitable for the case, the parties are encouraged to use Judge Lehrburger's model Joint Electronic Discovery Submission and Proposed Order. These forms are available on the SDNY website at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Lehrburger. (rsh)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 01/15 2:40 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Court will adjourn the conference to a different date. In the future, however, Counsel must provide a reason justifying any requested adjournment. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 01/15/2025) (ar)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 01/15 11:20 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Diane Windholz dated January 14, 2025. Document filed by The Fresh Air Fund..(Hines, Olivia)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 01/15 11:27 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 2/25/2025 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
14 14 discov Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report Tue 01/14 12:18 PM
RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by The Fresh Air Fund..(Hines, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Fri 12/27 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 1/27/2025.(sge)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
13 13 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Thu 12/26 10:42 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/9/2025. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 12/24 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2025 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The conference will be held telephonically. The parties are instructed to call (646) 453-4442 and enter access code 940338486#. Counsel shall jointly complete and file Judge Lehrburger's [Proposed] Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which must be submitted in compliance with Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices no later than one week before the initial case management conference. If suitable for the case, the parties are encouraged to use Judge Lehrburger's model Joint Electronic Discovery Submission and Proposed Order. These forms are available on the SDNY website at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Lehrburger. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 12/23 9:58 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/23/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/20 11:30 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by The Fresh Air Fund..(Hines, Olivia)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/20 11:29 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Fresh Air Fund..(Hines, Olivia)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/20 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diane Windholz on behalf of The Fresh Air Fund..(Windholz, Diane)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/20 11:22 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olivia Hines on behalf of The Fresh Air Fund..(Hines, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/19 12:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Fresh Air Fund waiver sent on 10/23/2024, answer due 12/23/2024. Document filed by Donald Fields..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jillian Tattersall on behalf of Donald Fields..(Tattersall, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 10/15 2:19 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Fresh Air Fund. (sj)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/15 12:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Fresh Air Fund, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Donald Fields..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/15 9:22 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 10/15 2:11 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marshall Benjamin Bellovin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:1981. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:2000e. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 10/15 2:14 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 10/15 2:16 PM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 10/15 2:16 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/14 6:48 PM
COMPLAINT against The Fresh Air Fund. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30035746)Document filed by Donald Fields..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]