New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Referred: Elizabeth A Pascal
Case #: 1:24-cv-09776
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2024
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 7:13 AM EDT
Defendant
AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
MATTHEW A LEMBO
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BARBARA MENICHINI
Represented By
SHAUNA BRIE ITRI
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info
ANDREW W. FERICH
Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 02/18 9:22 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
12 12 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Create Case Association Tue 02/18 9:20 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL: The case file for the Consolidated Action will be maintained under Master File No. 1:24-cv-09752-RMB-EAP; Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Action shall file an operative, consolidated complaint within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/14/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 11/26 8:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.. (LEMBO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/26 11:03 AM
LETTER ORDER Granting Defendant's request for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/26/2024. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Mon 11/25 4:21 PM
Letter from Matthew Lembo re1 Complaint. (LEMBO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 11/12 9:56 AM
Clerk's Text Order - The document8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/26/2024. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
8 8 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 11/11 7:55 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (LEMBO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
7 7 3 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/07 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW A LEMBO on behalf of AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. (LEMBO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/28 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHAUNA BRIE ITRI on behalf of BARBARA MENICHINI (ITRI, SHAUNA)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/28 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER on behalf of BARBARA MENICHINI (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/23 1:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by BARBARA MENICHINI. AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. served on 10/22/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
qc QC - Fillable PDF Mon 10/21 11:56 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Diversity Disclosure Statement3 filed on 10/18/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 1:43 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by BARBARA MENICHINI. (FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 10/17 3:07 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 10/17 3:04 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmr)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 10/17 3:10 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
1 1 56 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/14 11:56 PM
COMPLAINT against AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15735679) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BARBARA MENICHINI.(FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/17 12:59 PM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (mmb )
Related: [-]