Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Jorge L Alonso
Case #: 1:24-cv-10193
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2024
Terminated:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 5:21 AM CDT
Defendant
New Ying
Defendant
StemeduLin
Defendant
Shopique
Defendant
SeolGold
Defendant
Selected Department Stores
Defendant
Sara Premium Shop
Defendant
Preferential Kitchen
Defendant
Pitaya Hoting
Defendant
PPrestigeMart
Defendant
Oxygen premium
Defendant
OKtwo
Defendant
Nine Foxes
Defendant
TKone
Defendant
Nature space
Defendant
NaNa Suko
Defendant
NICEumi
Defendant
NIANNIANDIAN
Defendant
MingYixin
Defendant
Ming Yixin Hardware
Defendant
Miloscrafts
Defendant
Martins Boutique
Defendant
MOHE CLEAN
Defendant
Lumeo
Defendant
Longxiang Daily
Defendant
Yuyao Department Trade
Defendant
zhuyuantian
Defendant
sunXIANSHENG
Defendant
sreagood
Defendant
sincere treatment
Defendant
sherosix
Defendant
jintong C
Defendant
iF YOU Underwear
Defendant
fengjingx
Defendant
dafadafa money coming
Defendant
ZHANG ZHOU
Defendant
ZFLSTARSHINE
Defendant
LULUZOOM
Defendant
Yuemei Mall
Defendant
Yi DI
Defendant
Xilelo
Defendant
Xikuo Ecommerce Firm
Defendant
Xiaoyuu Shop
Defendant
Xblade
Defendant
XLJClean
Defendant
XABS
Defendant
We Sail
Defendant
Temiu
Defendant
Dacheng Home Furnishings
Defendant
GUANGKUO M
Defendant
GLODEL
Defendant
GETIFIT SHOP
Defendant
GAOCHALE C
Defendant
FIONAHOME
Defendant
FAN Universe
Defendant
Expert fencer
Defendant
Elite Choice Aurora
Defendant
Dawn Sun
Defendant
DailyDwelling Delights
Defendant
GUANGKUO R
Defendant
DONY HOME
Defendant
DOD Home
Defendant
CouekdlG
Defendant
Color skin care products
Defendant
CoCo Mojo
Defendant
ChloEz
Represented By
Ni Xue
Kemet Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Cfinkds
Defendant
CLOEIS
Defendant
Betta S
Defendant
THE PARTNERSHIPS AND UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATIONS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE A
Defendant
He lives in
Defendant
LONGQUAN
Defendant
LIKE SMART HOME
Defendant
LEE House
Defendant
LDQ Brand Shop
Defendant
Kuaile Shopping
Defendant
Kaqulec
Defendant
Joyful Overseas Shopping
Defendant
Jinfan Household Products
Defendant
JIMITE
Defendant
Home Life pave
Defendant
GUOYUMAI
Defendant
Haoge Ecommerce
Defendant
Hang Yang household
Defendant
HFfeitao
Defendant
Goya shops
Defendant
Goleeguli
Defendant
Golden Premium Department
Defendant
Glomax
Defendant
Glacio Life
Defendant
Get A Break House
Defendant
GZL Housewares
Plaintiff
Shenzhen Quanxindi Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Konrad Val Sherinian
The Law Offices Of Konrad Sherinian, LLC
contact info
Depeng Bi
The Law Offices Of Konrad Sherinian, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/26/2025 2:34 AM CST
Monday, October 14, 2024
1 1 13 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Shenzhen Quanxindi Technology Co. Ltd.; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22598342.(Sherinian, Konrad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. 1 - An Infringing Product Listing,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. 2 - U.S. Pat. No. D991,607,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. 3 - Intellectual Property Rights Seizure Statistics,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. 4 - Alibaba, Amazon, and Counterfeiting in the Age of the Internet,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh. 5 - Combating Trafficking in Counterfeit and Pirated Goods
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Shenzhen Quanxindi Technology Co. Ltd. by Depeng Bi (Bi, Depeng)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Shenzhen Quanxindi Technology Co. Ltd. Sealed Schedule A to Complaint (Sherinian, Konrad)
Related: [-]