Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Case #: 1:24-cv-23957
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Terminated:Nov 01, 2024
Case in other court:11th Judicial Circuit, 24-013016-CA-01
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 6:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Eric Goldberg
Miami-Dade County Attorney's Office 111 NW 1st Street Suite 2810
Miami, FL 33128
Represented By
Erica Sunny Shultz Zaron
Miami-Dade County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Miami-Dade County
Miami-Dade County Attorney's Office 111 NW 1st Street Suite 2810
Miami, FL 33128
Represented By
Erica Sunny Shultz Zaron
Miami-Dade County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Samuel Lee Restricted Filer - Smith, Jr.
16614 SW 99 Ct.
Miami, FL 33157
Represented By
Colin H.F. Richards
Colin Richards Law P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
18 18 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 02/05 12:39 PM
ORDER RESTRICTING FILING PRIVILEGES: The Clerk is DIRECTED not to accept any future filings from Plaintiff unless Plaintiff (1) pays the filing fee; (2) affirms under oath that he is in imminent threat of serious physical injury; (3) is represented by counsel; or (4) obtains leave of court to file. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/4/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
17 17 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Thu 11/14 4:30 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to16 Transmittal Letter Sent,15 Order. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
16 16 misc Transmittal Letter Sent to State Court - FORM Mon 11/04 1:04 PM
Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit. State Court Case Number: 2024-013016-CA-01 (ls)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Order on Motion to Vacate Mon 11/04 1:01 PM
ORDER granting13 Unopposed Motion to Remand to State Court; Remanding Case to the Circuit Court of the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County; denying as moot11 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Joint Scheduling Order, Certificate of Interest Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Nunc Pro Tunc); denying as moot11 MOTION to Vacate10 Order dated 11/1/2024, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(B)(1)(B), 60(B)(1), and 59(E). Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 11/04 10:16 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re11 First MOTION for Rule 60 . Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s) ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. AND Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief ; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
13 13 motion Remand to State Court Fri 11/01 9:05 PM
First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Samuel Smith. (Richards, Colin)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Fri 11/01 9:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Samuel Smith (Richards, Colin)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Rule 60 Fri 11/01 8:55 PM
First MOTION for Rule 60 by Samuel Smith. Responses due by 11/15/2024.(Richards, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Unsworn Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT
10 10 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 11/01 9:34 AM
ORDER the case is DISMISSED without prejudice, and all pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/31/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 10/29 10:27 AM
ORDER Joint Scheduling Report,corporate disclosure statements and certificates of interested parties due by 10/30/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 4:27 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Eric Goldberg, Miami-Dade County (Zaron, Erica)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Status Report Fri 10/18 4:13 PM
STATUS REPORT Removal by Eric Goldberg, Miami-Dade County (Zaron, Erica)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 10/18 2:15 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Eric Goldberg, Miami-Dade County. Responses due by 11/1/2024. (Zaron, Erica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 10/15 5:33 PM
ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time permitted by the rules. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 10/15 5:30 PM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 10/25/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Status Report Order Tue 10/15 5:29 PM
ORDER Requiring a Removal Status Report by 10/25/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 10/15 11:57 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Tue 10/15 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) No answer/motion to dismiss filed.Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17905201, filed by Eric Goldberg, Miami-Dade County.(Zaron, Erica) Modified text on 10/15/2024 (gqa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2