Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:24-bk-16536

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Mindy A Mora
Case #: 9:24-ap-01408
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Michael Callow
1140 NE Town Terrace
Jensen Beach, FL 34957
Represented By
John Michael Callow
contact info
Plaintiff
First National Bank of Omaha
3233 Thomasville Road
Tallahassee, FL 32308
Represented By
Eric S Haug
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 11:34 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Continued Hearing Filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha Related [+]. (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
12 12 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Tue 04/29 12:51 PM
Notice of Continued Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2025 at 10:00 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment Against John Michael Callow Filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha
Sunday, March 30, 2025
11 11 misc Affidavit Sun 03/30 3:43 PM
Affidavit of Anthony Vote Filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha Related [+]. (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment Against John Michael Callow filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha
10 10 attyhrg Notice of Hearing by Filer Sun 03/30 3:40 PM
Notice of Hearing by Filer Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2025 at 10:00 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment Against John Michael Callow Filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha
9 9 motion Default Judgment Sun 03/30 3:35 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against John Michael Callow Filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 21, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/22 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant John Michael Callow (Re:6 Motion for Default Against Defendant John Michael Callow Filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha)
Thursday, December 19, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/19 2:13 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant John Michael Callow Related [+] (Tate, Racquel)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Against Defendant John Michael Callow Filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha
6 6 motion Default Thu 12/19 12:12 AM
Motion for Default Against Defendant John Michael Callow Filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, October 17, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 10/17 4:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on John Michael Callow 10/17/2024 Filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha, Defendant John Michael Callow. (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
4 4 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 10/16 3:13 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/04/2024 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Tate, Racquel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha
3 3 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 10/16 1:58 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on John Michael Callow Answer Due 11/15/2024 (Tate, Racquel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 10/15 11:54 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha. (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/15 11:52 AM
Adversary case 24-01408 Complaint by First National Bank of Omaha against John Michael Callow. Nature of Suit:,(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A