Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:23-bk-00603

Iowa Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Thad J Collins
Case #: 6:24-ap-09026
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation
Ashford Bldg 6805 Vista Dr
West Des Moines, IA 50266
Represented By
Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Shelly Whalen
1625 Darby St
Waterloo, IA 50702
Represented By
Steven G. Klesner
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
United States Federal Courthouse 111 7th Avenue SE, Box 17
Cedar Rapids, IA 52401


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
8 8 order Extend Time Thu 04/10 11:53 AM
Order Extending Discovery Deadline to May 7, 2025 Related [+] Ordered on 4/10/2025. (sgre)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, April 07, 2025
7 7 motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 04/07 8:49 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Complete Discovery to May 7, 2025 Filed by Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation (Cronin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
6 6 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/06 1:55 PM
Scheduling Order Ordered on 12/6/2024. Related [+] Discovery due by 4/7/2025. Pre Trial Statement Due by 5/7/2025. (sgre)
Related: [-] 5 Order Setting Scheduling Conference
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 order Setting Scheduling Conference Fri 11/08 9:59 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Ordered on 11/8/2024. Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/6/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephonic Hearing (dcri)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/07 3:01 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation. (Cronin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed/Unexecuted Tue 10/15 12:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation 10/15/2024 (Klesner, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued/Reissued Tue 10/15 10:25 AM
Summons Issued on Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation Date Issued 10/15/2024, Answer Due 11/19/2024. (sgre)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/14 4:25 PM
Adversary case 24-09026 Complaint by Shelly Whalen against Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation Fee EXEMPT. (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Klesner, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet