Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald L Jackson
Case #: 6:24-cv-00383
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Terminated:May 15, 2025
Case in other court:Pittsburg County District Court, CJ-24-00203
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 5:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By
Montana Williams
Collins Zorn & Wagner, PLLC
contact info
Wellon B. Poe
Collins Zorn & Wagner, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Loyd D. London
Represented By
Frank W. Frasier
Frasier Frasier & Hickman, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Chris Morris
Terminated: 10/28/2024
Represented By
Matthew Dunn
Best & Sharp, PC
contact info
Emily Wilson
Best & Sharp, PC
contact info
Movant
Mike Haynes
Terminated: 10/29/2024
Represented By
Wellon B. Poe
Collins Zorn & Wagner, PLLC
contact info
Movant
Charlie Rogers
Terminated: 10/29/2024
Represented By
Wellon B. Poe
Collins Zorn & Wagner, PLLC
contact info
Movant
Ross Selman
Terminated: 10/29/2024
Represented By
Wellon B. Poe
Collins Zorn & Wagner, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
34 34 order 01 - Order Case - Dismissed/Terminated Thu 05/15 5:48 PM
JUDGMENT DISMISSING ACTION BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. (case terminated) (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 05/15 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Loyd D. London (Frasier, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
32 32 order Ruling on Motion to Extend Deadline(s) Tue 05/13 10:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson granting31 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time as to Discovery Responses. Accordingly, Plaintiff has until 5/27/2025 to respond to Defendant Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioner's discovery requests, and until 5/30/2025 to respond to Defendant Chris Morris' discovery requests. (daw, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
31 31 motion Extend Deadline(s) Mon 05/12 5:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline(s) as to Discovery Responses by Loyd D. London Responses due by 5/26/2025(Frasier, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
30 30 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Fri 12/27 10:27 AM
DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Loyd D. London (Frasier, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
29 29 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Thu 12/19 3:16 PM
DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Chris Morris(individual) (Dunn, Matthew)
Related: [-]
28 28 order 05 - Scheduling Order Thu 12/19 2:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson setting Scheduling Order dates: Exhibit List due by 2/3/2025; Witness List due by 2/3/2025; Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2025; Joinder of Parties due by 3/14/2025; Discovery due by 8/1/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2025; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/24/2025; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 12/31/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2026 at 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 327, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. Jury Trial set for 1/20/2026 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. (daw, Chambers) Modified on 12/19/2024 to correct text (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes 31 - Scheduling Conference Held Thu 12/19 11:35 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/2024. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
26 26 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Wed 12/18 3:04 PM
DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners (Williams, Montana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
25 25 order 09 - MO re Consent to Magistrate Judge by Joint Status Report Case - Number Changed Tue 12/17 3:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: The parties have expressly indicated in the Joint Status Report signed by an authorized representative of each party in this case that they wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this case. As a result, this case is deemed CONSENTED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE without the necessity for the filing or submission of any other documentation. The United States Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over this case through and including trial and the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a). All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-24-383-GLJ. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
24 24 misc Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 Fri 12/13 3:55 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners (Williams, Montana)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 12/13 3:37 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Montana Williams on behalf of Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners (Williams, Montana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
22 22 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Thu 11/14 4:10 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 12/19/2024 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. Counsel should inform Paige Bruce at Paige_Bruce@oked.uscourts.gov of a telephone number where they may be reached should it be different from the number of record in the case. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 12/13/2024.(daw, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
21 21 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Referred to MJ Thu 11/14 11:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: The parties are advised that this case has been referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson for all pretrial and discovery matters, including dispositive motions, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-24-383-RAW-GLJ. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
20 20 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Tue 11/12 9:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-24-383-RAW. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
19 19 order Ruling on Motion to Quash Mon 11/04 12:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson denying as moot13 Special Appearance and MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Service of Summons and Brief in Support in light of the filing of the17 Stipulation of Dismissal. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Mon 11/04 12:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson denying as moot9 Partial Motion to Dismiss in light of the filing of the16 Stipulation of Dismissal. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/29 4:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, dismissing Individual Board of County Commissioners Ross Selman, Charlie Rogers and Mike Haynes, dismissing all claims, Related [+] by Mike Haynes, Chris Morris(Pittsburg County Sheriff, official capacity), Chris Morris(individual), Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners, Charlie Rogers, Ross Selman (Poe, Wellon)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
Monday, October 28, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/28 11:43 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, dismissing Chris Morris, in his official capacity, dismissing All claims, Related [+] by Chris Morris(Pittsburg County Sheriff, official capacity) (Wilson, Emily)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Wed 10/23 2:46 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chris Morris(individual) (Wilson, Emily)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Wed 10/23 11:36 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Loyd D. London (Frasier, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
13 13 motion Quash Tue 10/22 4:39 PM
MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Service of Summons and Brief in Support and Special Appearance by Ross Selman, Mike Haynes, Charlie Rogers [NOTE: Attorney Wellon B. Poe added to party Ross Selman(pty:mov), Attorney Wellon B. Poe added to party Mike Haynes(pty:mov), Attorney Wellon B. Poe added to party Charlie Rogers(pty:mov)]. Responses due by 11/5/2024(Poe, Wellon)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to State Court Petition/Complaint Tue 10/22 4:27 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court Related [+] by Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners (Poe, Wellon)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
11 11 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 10/22 4:26 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Wellon B. Poe on behalf of Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners (Poe, Wellon)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Paid in Full - CV Tue 10/22 10:15 AM
FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/22/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-2008455 Related [+] by Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners (Poe, Wellon)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Removal
Monday, October 21, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to State Court Petition/Complaint Mon 10/21 2:51 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court Related [+] by Chris Morris(individual ) (Wilson, Emily)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
9 9 motion Dismiss Mon 10/21 2:49 PM
Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Chris Morris(Pittsburg County Sheriff, official capacity) Responses due by 11/4/2024(Wilson, Emily)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/21 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Chris Morris(Pittsburg County Sheriff, official capacity), Chris Morris(individual ) (Wilson, Emily)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance - Attorney Mon 10/21 2:34 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew Dunn on behalf of Chris Morris(Pittsburg County Sheriff, official capacity), Chris Morris(individual ) (Dunn, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance - Attorney Mon 10/21 2:32 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emily Wilson on behalf of Chris Morris(Pittsburg County Sheriff, official capacity), Chris Morris(individual ) (Wilson, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
5 5 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Parties to File Disclosure Statements Tue 10/15 10:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (mdc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Submission of Notice of Consent or DJO in Magistrate Assigned Cases Tue 10/15 10:28 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at[LINK:https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil] in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days.(Miscellaneous Deadline set for 11/5/2024). (mdc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - New CV Notice of Removal Case Filing Fee Payment Tue 10/15 10:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Defendant is directed to pay the $405 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 10/22/2024) Related [+]. (mdc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Removal
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Tue 10/15 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Removal from Pittsburg County District Court, case number CJ-2024-203 by Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners (With attachments). (mdc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/15 10:05 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners. (mdc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
cmp State Court Petition/Complaint Tue 10/15 9:59 AM
PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Chris Morris(Pittsburg County Sheriff, official capacity), Chris Morris(individual ), Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners by Loyd D. London. (mdc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]