Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen C Dries
Case #: 2:24-cv-01310
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 6:31 AM CDT
Defendant
Menomonee Falls Police Department
Represented By
Colin J Casper
Kasdorf Lewis & Swietlik Sc
contact info
Defendant
Eugene Neyhart
Represented By
Colin J Casper
Kasdorf Lewis & Swietlik Sc
contact info
Defendant
Village of Menomonee Falls
Represented By
Colin J Casper
Kasdorf Lewis & Swietlik Sc
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy Walz
Represented By
Colin J Casper
Kasdorf Lewis & Swietlik Sc
contact info
Defendant
Mark Waters
Represented By
Colin J Casper
Kasdorf Lewis & Swietlik Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Mayer
W172N9496 Ericka Road
Menomonee Falls, WI 53051


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
26 26 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/02 11:11 AM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by Matthew Mayer re8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement . (kah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
25 25 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/19 2:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 3/19/2025. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(kah)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/19 1:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 3/19/2025. Discovery due by 10/15/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2025 (copy mailed to Pro se Plaintiff). (Tape #Zoom Audio) (kah)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/19 9:23 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 3/19/2025 providing Mayer another opportunity to respond to8 the defendants' motion to dismiss. Mayer's response brief is now due by April 2, 2025. If Mayer fails to file a response by March 28, I will address the defendants' motion without the benefit of hearing from him. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(kah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
22 22 misc Letter Thu 03/13 3:36 PM
LETTER from Attorney Colin J. Casper dated 3/13/25 . (Casper, Colin)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/13 3:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Casper, Colin)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/13 3:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Casper, Colin)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Thu 03/13 2:54 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Defendants. (Casper, Colin)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Thu 03/13 1:32 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Matthew Mayer.(kah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Thursday, February 20, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 02/20 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2025 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 3/13/2025. The parties shall call the court Zoom conference line at 669-254-5252 and use meeting ID 161 4125 0515 and passcode 414014 to join the call. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to pro se Plaintiff)(kah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge on Consent Tue 02/18 12:41 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/18/2025. The parties have consented to the exercise of jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that this action is reassigned to him for all further proceedings. Judge Lynn Adelman no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(amh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
15 15 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 02/14 10:06 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Casper, Colin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
14 14 misc Electronic Exhibit(s) Thu 02/13 1:31 PM
Exhibit A to9 Brief in Support of Motion filed by Jeremy Walz, Menomonee Falls Police Department, Mark Waters, Village of Menomonee Falls, Eugene Neyhart (NOT AVAILABLE ON PACER; Exhibits contained on flash drive stored in clerk's office; exhibits are electronically stored ) (jcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
13 13 misc Affidavit Fri 02/07 3:56 PM
Affidavit of Mailing AFFIDAVIT of Madison P. Bushman .(Casper, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Mailing Affidavit
12 12 misc Letter Fri 02/07 2:52 PM
LETTER from Attorney Colin J. Casper . (Casper, Colin)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Declaration Fri 02/07 2:50 PM
DECLARATION of Colin J. Casper(Casper, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Colin J. Casper
10 10 misc Letter Fri 02/07 2:48 PM
LETTER from Attorney Colin J. Casper . (Casper, Colin)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Brief in Support of Motion Fri 02/07 2:41 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement . (Casper, Colin)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss More Definite Statement Fri 02/07 2:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement by All Defendants. (Casper, Colin)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss More Definite Statement Fri 02/07 2:03 PM
DISREGARD - TO BE RE-FILED MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement by All Defendants.(Casper, Colin) Modified on 2/7/2025 (lz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter to the Court,
Att: 2 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or For A More Definite Statement,
Att: 3 Declaration of Colin J. Casper,
Att: 4 Cover Letter to Court Clerk regarding Exhibit A to the Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Colin J. Casper,
Att: 6 Affidavit of Mailing
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/10 2:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Waters - Waiver sent on 12/9/2024. (jcl)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/10 2:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeremy Walz - Waiver sent on 12/9/2024. (jcl)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/10 2:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Neyhart - Waiver sent on 12/9/2024. (jcl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/09 12:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Matthew Mayer(jcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
2 2 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 11/06 8:21 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Matthew Mayer. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint - Pro Se Tue 10/15 1:02 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Matthew Mayer. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Jury Demand (Filing Fee PAID ;receipt# 96855) (Service Packet Issued)(jcl)
Related: [-]