California Eastern District Court
Judge:Daniel J Calabretta
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:24-cv-02813
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Terminated:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 3:16 AM PDT
Defendant
California Franchise Tax Board
Represented By
Rachel Yeon Yoo
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Assistant Attorney General
Represented By
Halsey Diakow, GOVT
Doj-Tax
contact info
Defendant
United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Represented By
Halsey Diakow, GOVT
Doj-Tax
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Gene Yahne
13993 Seven Cedars Dr
Grass Valley, CA 95945

GPO Oct 17 2024
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/16/24, ORDERING that plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than 11/6/24, why this court has subject matter jurisdiction over his case. If plaintiff fails to respond by 11/6/24, the court will recommend dismissal of his case without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Salmeron, A)
GPO Nov 13 2024
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/12/2024 RECOMMENDING this case be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and for failure to prosecute, and that this case be closed. Referred to Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Yin, K)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
21 21 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 03/19 3:39 PM
USCA CASE NUMBER 25-1796 for17 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott Gene Yahne. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/05 5:05 PM
NOTICE by Scott Gene Yahne re17 Notice of Appeal. (Deputy Clerk LMS)
Related: [-]
19 19 appeal Appeal Processed to USCA Tue 03/04 8:41 AM
APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re17 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott Gene Yahne. Notice of Appeal filed *3/3/2025*, Complaint filed *10/15/2024* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *2/24/2025*. Court Reporter: *N/A*. *Fee Status: Paid on 3/3/2025 in the amount of $605.00* (Deputy Clerk LMS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Information
service Service by Mail Tue 03/04 9:47 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:19 Appeal Processed to USCA, served on Scott Gene Yahne. (Deputy Clerk LMS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
18 18 appeal Receipt of Appeal Fee Tue 03/04 8:39 AM
USCA APPEAL FEES received in the amount of $ 605 Related [+] from Scott Gene Yahne on 3/3/2025 re17 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott Gene Yahne. (Deputy Clerk LMS)
Related: [-] ceipt # 200011637
17 17 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 03/04 8:36 AM
NOTICE of APPEAL by Scott Gene Yahne as to16 Judgment,15 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations. (Deputy Clerk LMS)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
16 16 order Judgment Mon 02/24 9:39 AM
JUDGMENT dated *02/24/25* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 02/21/25. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/24 9:38 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 02/21/25 ADOPTING9 Findings and Recommendations in full and DIMSSING this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. CASE CLOSED. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Mon 02/24 9:40 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:15 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and16 Judgment served on Scott Gene Yahne. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
14 14 respm Joinder Thu 01/02 3:24 PM
JOINDER by California Franchise Tax Board in re13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Deputy Assistant Attorney General, United States of America Internal Revenue Service. Attorney Yoo, Rachel Yeon added. (Yoo, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/18 2:41 PM
MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER re1 Complaint by Deputy Assistant Attorney General, United States of America Internal Revenue Service(Cincinnati, Ohio), United States of America Internal Revenue Service(Fresno, California). Attorney Diakow, Halsey added. (Diakow, Halsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
12 12 misc Request for Entry of Default Fri 12/13 4:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Defendants by Scott Gene Yahne. (Becknal, R.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/25 8:02 AM
Proof of Payment/Discharge by Scott Gene Yahne (Kyono, V)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/20 7:43 AM
NOTICE re6 Consent/Decline of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Scott Gene Yahne. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
9 9 motion Findings and Recommendations Wed 11/13 2:32 PM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/12/2024 RECOMMENDING this case be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and for failure to prosecute, and that this case be closed. Referred to Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Wed 11/13 2:33 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:9 Findings and Recommendations served on Scott Gene Yahne. (Yin, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 10/28 9:49 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Scott Gene Yahne. (Kyono, V)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 10/24 8:55 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Scott Gene Yahne. California Franchise Tax Board; Deputy Assistant Attorney General; United States of America Internal Revenue Service(Cincinnati, Ohio); United States of America Internal Revenue Service(Fresno, California) served on 10/22/2024. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
6 6 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 10/23 8:23 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
5 5 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 10/17 10:55 AM
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/16/24, ORDERING that plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than 11/6/24, why this court has subject matter jurisdiction over his case. If plaintiff fails to respond by 11/6/24, the court will recommend dismissal of his case without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Salmeron, A)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 10/17 10:55 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Order to Show Cause, served on Scott Gene Yahne. (Salmeron, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for DJC Tue 10/15 12:48 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
3 3 service Summons Tue 10/15 12:48 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Deputy Assistant Attorney General, United States of America Internal Revenue Service(Cincinnati, Ohio), United States of America Internal Revenue Service(Fresno, California)* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Scott Gene Yahne* *13993 Seven Cedars Dr* *Grass Valley, CA 95945*. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Tue 10/15 12:47 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Franchise Tax Board* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Scott Gene Yahne* *13993 Seven Cedars Dr* *Grass Valley, CA 95945*. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
1 1 61 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/15 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against California Franchise Tax Board, Deputy Assistant Attorney General, United States of America Internal Revenue Service(Cincinnati, Ohio), United States of America Internal Revenue Service(Fresno, California) by Scott Gene Yahne. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Affidavit
misc Receipt Tue 10/15 12:45 PM
RECEIPT number 200009528 for $405.00 from Scott Gene Yahne. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Tue 10/15 12:49 PM
SERVICE AT COUNTER:4 Civil New Case Documents for DJC,2 Summons,3 Summons, served on Scott Gene Yahne. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]