Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert J White
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-12724
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 6:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Eberspaecher Controls North America, Inc
Represented By
Justin Daniel Debettencourt
Reed Smith
contact info
Eric J. Minch
The Miller Law Firm P.C.
contact info
Oliver K Beiersdorf
Reed Smith
contact info
Marc L. Newman
The Miller Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Eberspcher Controls Landau GmbH & Co. KG
Plaintiff
FCA US LLC
Represented By
Fred J. Fresard
Klein Thomas Lee & Fresard
contact info
David M. Dell
Klein Thomas Lee & Fresard
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
23 23 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 04/15 4:21 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Derek H. Swanson appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Swanson, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 03/10 11:03 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Eberspaecher Controls North America, Inc. (Beiersdorf, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Fri 03/07 11:07 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. FCA US LLC waiver sent on 3/6/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Dell, David) Modified on 3/7/2025 (LHam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
20 20 service Summons Issued* Tue 02/25 11:11 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Eberspcher Controls Landau GmbH & Co. KG* (LHam)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
19 19 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Mon 02/24 4:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by FCA US LLC against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Fresard, Fred)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 02/24 1:25 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Permitting Filing of Amended Complaint and Dismissing ECF No.17 as Moot. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
service Request for Additional Summons Mon 02/24 4:08 PM
REQUEST for SUMMONS for Eberspcher Controls Landau GmbH & Co. KG. (Fresard, Fred)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
17 17 motion Motion - Free Leave to File Wed 02/05 5:23 PM
MOTION , MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint by FCA US LLC. (Dell, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Redlined Amended Complaint)
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/07 11:47 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/19/2025; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/2/2026; Remote Interim Status Conference set for 11/19/2025 at 10:00 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2026 at 1:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 7/21/2026 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Robert J. White. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. Related [+] (TVil)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 01/07 11:39 AM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Robert J. White: Scheduling Conference held on 1/7/2025. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (TVil)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
15 15 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Mon 12/30 3:07 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Dell, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
14 14 notice Appearance Thu 12/19 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Daniel Debettencourt on behalf of Eberspaecher Controls North America, Inc. (Debettencourt, Justin)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Appearance Thu 12/19 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver K Beiersdorf on behalf of Eberspaecher Controls North America, Inc. (Beiersdorf, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/03 4:20 PM
ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference ( Remote Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2025 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Robert J. White ). Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
11 11 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 11/27 4:23 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Eberspaecher Controls North America, Inc (Minch, Eric)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/27 4:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Eberspaecher Controls North America, Inc. (Minch, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
9 9 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Thu 11/07 9:00 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FCA US LLC identifying Other Affiliate FCA Foreign Sales Holdco Ltd. (UK), Other Affiliate FCA North American Holdings LLC for FCA US LLC. (Dell, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
8 8 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 11/01 1:27 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint ( Response due by 11/27/2024 ) Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Fri 11/01 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc L. Newman on behalf of Eberspaecher Controls North America, Inc. (Newman, Marc)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Fri 11/01 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Minch on behalf of Eberspaecher Controls North America, Inc. (Minch, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
5 5 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/22 2:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Eberspaecher Controls North America, Inc served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024. (Dell, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
4 4 notice Practice Guidelines Wed 10/16 1:40 PM
Notice of District Judge Robert J. White's Case Management Requirements. (TVil)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued* Wed 10/16 11:08 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Eberspaecher Controls North America, Inc* (SHic)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Attorney Appearance Wed 10/16 9:23 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David M. Dell appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Dell, David)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 10/16 11:08 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SHic)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
1 1 10 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 10/15 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT filed by FCA US LLC against EBERSPAECHER CONTROLS NORTH AMERICA, INC. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9977664 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Fresard, Fred)
Related: [-]