District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Ana C Reyes
Case #: 1:24-cv-02919
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 6:19 AM EDT
Defendant
CHRISTINE WORMUTH
Represented By
Alane Ballweg
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Defendant
MERRICK B. GARLAND
Represented By
Alane Ballweg
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Defendant
MATTHEW M. GRAVES
U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia
Washington, DC 20530
Represented By
Alane Ballweg
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE
Represented By
Elizabeth M. Chiarello
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Hay
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emily Mily Wexler
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
C. K. Kevin Park
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Esther N. Leibfarth
National Veterans Legal Services Program
contact info
Rochelle Bobroff
National Veterans Legal Services Program
contact info
Susan K. Whaley
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark C. Priebe
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KYLE A. SMOKE
Represented By
Elizabeth M. Chiarello
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Hay
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emily Mily Wexler
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
C. K. Kevin Park
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Esther N. Leibfarth
National Veterans Legal Services Program
contact info
Rochelle Bobroff
National Veterans Legal Services Program
contact info
Susan K. Whaley
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark C. Priebe
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
38 38 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Request for Pre-Motion Conference by MERRICK B. GARLAND, MATTHEW M. GRAVES, CHRISTINE WORMUTH (Ballweg, Alane)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 5:05 PM
NOTICE Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference by JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE (Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 04/30 3:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting35 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS that Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs'31 Amended Motion to Certify Class is stayed until further order of the Court. The parties shall proceed with their pre-motion notices. After the pre-motion notices and responses are filed, the Courts ORDERS the parties to contact the Courtroom Deputy, Chashawn White, chashawn_white@dcd.uscourts.gov, to schedule a hearing on the pre-motion notices. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 4/30/2025. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
35 35 3 pgs motion Stay Tue 04/29 5:14 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Response to Plaintiffs' Revised Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel (ECF No. 34) by MERRICK B. GARLAND, MATTHEW M. GRAVES, CHRISTINE WORMUTH.(Ballweg, Alane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
34 34 misc Errata Tue 04/22 8:38 PM
ERRATA by KYLE A. SMOKE re31 Motion to Certify Class,, Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel,.(Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Revised Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Report to Congress on the Use of Open-Air Burn Pits by the U.S. Armed Forces,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Rochelle Bobroff,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Daniel J. Hay,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 21, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Cunningham, Jr on behalf of JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE (Cunningham, Timothy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 1:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Timothy E. Cunningham, Jr. is admitted pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 4/21/2025. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
32 32 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/18 5:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Timothy E. Cunningham, Jr., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11628815. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE. (Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
31 31 6 pgs motion Certify Class Fri 04/18 5:40 PM
Amended MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Counsel by JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE.(Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
30 30 misc Administrative Record Tue 04/01 3:42 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Index (Smoke) by CHRISTINE WORMUTH, MATTHEW M. GRAVES, MERRICK B. GARLAND.(Ballweg, Alane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Administrative Record Index (McIntyre)
Friday, January 24, 2025
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 01/24 10:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting in part29 Motion to Stay Answer Deadline. The Court ORDERS that the motion to stay is GRANTED; ORDERS that Defendants' Answer deadline is stayed until further order of the Court; and ORDERS the parties to abide by the following briefing schedule: 1. Defendants will provide Plaintiffs with the certified administrative record for review on or before March 18, 2025. 2. Defendants will file the certified index of the administrative record on or before April 1, 2025. 3. Plaintiffs will file an amended motion for class certification, if any, on or before April 18, 2025. 4. Either party shall file any pre-motion notice for a dispositive motion on or before May 1, 2025. After the pre-motions notices are fully briefed by both sides per the rules in the Judge's Standing Order, the parties should contact the courtroom deputy to set up a pre-motion conference. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 1/24/2025. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
29 29 motion Stay Fri 01/17 1:32 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline and Enter Briefing Schedule by CHRISTINE WORMUTH, MATTHEW M. GRAVES, MERRICK B. GARLAND.(Ballweg, Alane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
28 28 order Standing Order Tue 01/14 5:24 PM
STANDING ORDER. The Court ORDERS the parties to comply with the Court's Standing Order. See Standing Order for details. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 1/14/2025. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/13 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Esther N. Leibfarth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Leibfarth, Esther)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 01/10 12:55 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to KYLE A. SMOKE, JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE. Attorney Elizabeth M. Chiarello terminated. (Chiarello, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Mon 12/16 2:38 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by CHRISTINE WORMUTH, MATTHEW M. GRAVES, MERRICK B. GARLAND.(Ballweg, Alane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/16 3:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time; Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/17/2025. Defendants' response is due by January 17, 2025. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 12/16/2024. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/13 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alane Ballweg on behalf of All Defendants (Ballweg, Alane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Wed 11/27 11:35 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to KYLE A. SMOKE, JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE. Attorney C. K. Kevin Park terminated. (Park, C. K. Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
22 22 6 pgs motion Certify Class Thu 11/14 1:44 PM
MOTION to Certify Class And Appointment of Class Counsel by KYLE A. SMOKE, JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE.(Wexler, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Rochelle Bobroff,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Elizabeth M. Chiarello
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Tue 10/29 3:38 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/21/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/20/2024. (Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Tue 10/29 3:36 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/22/24. (Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 10/29 3:34 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTINE WORMUTH served on 10/22/2024 (Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/21 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Susan K. Whaley on behalf of JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE (Whaley, Susan)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/21 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Priebe on behalf of JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE (Priebe, Mark)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/21 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Mily Wexler on behalf of JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE (Wexler, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by C. K. Kevin Park on behalf of JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE (Park, C. K. Kevin)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Chiarello on behalf of JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE (Chiarello, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Fri 10/18 9:29 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK B. GARLAND U.S. Attorney General and MATTHEW M. GRAVES U.S. Attorney.(zdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
Thursday, October 17, 2024
12 12 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Thu 10/17 5:09 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE FOR Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Attorney General filed by KYLE A. SMOKE, JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE.(Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Thu 10/17 5:07 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE FOR MATTHEW M. GRAVES, U.S. ATTORNEY filed by KYLE A. SMOKE, JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE.(Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 10/17 4:40 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/17 4:38 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zsl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Thu 10/17 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding3 Request for Summons to Issue. The following error(s) need correction: Missing summonses- U.S. government. When naming a U.S. government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zsl)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/17 4:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Elizabeth Chiarello is admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 10/17/2024. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/17 4:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Emily Mily Wexler is admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 10/17/2024. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/17 4:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney C.K. Kevin Park is admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 10/17. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/17 4:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Mark Priebe is admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 10/17/2024. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/17 5:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Susan K. Whaley is admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 10/17/2024. (lcacr3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/16 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rochelle Bobroff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bobroff, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/16 12:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Susan K. Whaley, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11235432. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE. (Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/16 12:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark Priebe, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11235415. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE. (Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/16 12:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- C.K. Kevin Park, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11235397. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE. (Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/16 12:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emily Mily Wexler, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11235232. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE. (Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/16 11:55 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth A. Chiarello, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11235110. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE. (Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Wed 10/16 11:49 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by KYLE A. SMOKE, JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE.(Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/16 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Hay on behalf of JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE, KYLE A. SMOKE (Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/15 5:14 PM
COMPLAINT For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief against CHRISTINE WORMUTH ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11233158) filed by KYLE A. SMOKE, JENNIFER M. MCINTYRE.(Hay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet