Minnesota District Court
Judge:Nancy E Brasel
Referred: Shannon G Elkins
Case #: 0:24-cv-03909
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 5:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Justice Center
Defendant
Kurt Johnson
Defendant
Samuel Hansch
Defendant
Fifth Judicial District Deputy Administrator
Defendant
Greg Anderson
Defendant
Michael D. Trushenski
Defendant
Troy G. Timmerman
Defendant
Lea Silverthorn
Defendant
Amanda Peterson
Defendant
Martin County Courthouse
Defendant
Lissia K. Laehn
Defendant
Kelly Iverson
Defendant
Human Services of Faribault and Martin Counties
Defendant
Fairbault County Courthouse
Defendant
Fairbault County Attorney Office
Defendant
Cameron D. Davis
Plaintiff
Aaron James Laehn
40 1022 3rd Street North
St. James, MN 56081
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Taylor McGowan
Terminated: 11/04/2024
Defendant
Debra Weiderhof
Terminated: 11/04/2024
Defendant
Stephen Rolfsrud
Terminated: 11/04/2024
Defendant
Sonja Kruger
Terminated: 11/04/2024


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
15 15 appeal Supplemental Notice Sent to USCA Tue 03/18 3:37 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Order on Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal14 . (kt)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal Tue 03/18 3:14 PM
ORDER DENYING12 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 3/18/2025. (KMW)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
13 13 appeal Supplemental Notice Sent to USCA Fri 03/14 3:52 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Application to Proceed to Appeal In Forma Pauperis on Appeal12 . (MMP)
Related: [-]
11 11 appeal Supplemental Notice Sent to USCA Fri 03/14 3:48 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Receipt10 . (MMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
12 12 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal Fri 03/14 3:51 PM
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal filed by Aaron James Laehn.(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
10 10 misc Receipt Fri 03/14 3:47 PM
RECEIPT number 400008143 in the amount of $605.00 issued to Aaron James Laehn. (MMP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
9 9 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 02/12 8:15 AM
USCA Case Number 25-1280 for7 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Aaron James Laehn. (MMG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
8 8 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 02/10 3:18 PM
TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit7 . (MMG)
Related: [-]
7 7 appeal Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit Mon 02/10 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to5 Order Dismissing Case,6 Judgment by Aaron James Laehn.(MMG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, December 19, 2024
6 6 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Thu 12/19 3:01 PM
JUDGMENT(ACH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
5 5 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12/18 1:05 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff Aaron James Laehn's Complaint (comprised, for present purposes, of ECF Nos.1 and3 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) as discussed in the order. Laehn's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (ECF No. 2) and motion for injunctive relief (ECF No.4 ) are DENIED as moot. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 12/18/2024.(KMW)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
4 4 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 11/04 3:29 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Aaron James Laehn. (MMG)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 3:26 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cameron D. Davis, Fairbault County Attorney Office, Fairbault County Courthouse, Human Services of Faribault and Martin Counties, Kelly Iverson, Lissia K. Laehn, Martin County Courthouse, Amanda Peterson, Lea Silverthorn, Troy G. Timmerman, Michael D. Trushenski, Justice Center, Greg Anderson, Kurt Johnson, Samuel Hansch filed by Aaron James Laehn. (MMG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
2 2 motion Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP) Tue 10/15 2:12 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Aaron James Laehn. (jam)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/15 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Cameron D. Davis, Fairbault County Attorney Office, Fairbault County Courthouse, Human Services of Faribault and Martin Counties, Kelly Iverson, Sonja Kruger, Lissia K. Laehn, Martin County Courthouse, Taylor McGowan, Amanda Peterson, Stephen Rolfsrud, Lea Silverthorn, Troy G. Timmerman, Michael D. Trushenski, Debra Weiderhof filed by Aaron James Laehn. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins. (jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope