Missouri Western District Court
Judge:M Douglas Harpool
Case #: 6:24-cv-03291
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 American with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 5:41 AM CDT
Defendant
EnerSys Delaware Inc.
Represented By
Madeline Nebel
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Shelley Irene Ericsson
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-Kcmo
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne Williams
Represented By
Timothy Ricker
Hall Ansley, P.C.
contact info
Adam P. Pihana
Hall Ansley, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
EnerSys Energy Products Inc.
Terminated: 12/10/2024
Represented By
Madeline Nebel
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Shelley Irene Ericsson
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-Kcmo
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Mon 03/10 5:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EnerSys Delaware Inc. (Answers & Responses to P's 1st ROGs and Requests) filed by Madeline Nebel on behalf of Defendant EnerSys Delaware Inc..(Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
notice Notice of Filing Fri 02/28 1:02 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
23 23 adr Designation of Mediator Mon 02/24 8:19 AM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming David Vogel(Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
22 22 discov Certificate of Service Mon 02/17 4:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EnerSys Delaware Inc. (First Interrogatories and First Request for Documents to Plaintiff) filed by Madeline Nebel on behalf of Defendant EnerSys Delaware Inc..(Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
21 21 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 02/04 3:56 PM
ORDER granting joint20 motion for protective order. Signed on 02/04/2025 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Rotellini, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
20 20 motion Protective Order Thu 01/30 3:11 PM
Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Madeline Nebel on behalf of EnerSys Delaware Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/13/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
19 19 discov Certificate of Service Thu 01/23 4:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dwayne Williams plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and request for production directed to defendant filed by Timothy Ricker on behalf of Plaintiff Dwayne Williams.(Ricker, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
18 18 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Fri 01/10 12:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Madeline Nebel on behalf of Defendant EnerSys Delaware Inc..(Attorney Madeline Nebel added to party )(Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
17 17 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Tue 01/07 1:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Timothy Ricker on behalf of Plaintiff Dwayne Williams.(Ricker, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/02 10:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER:(Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2025.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2025., Joinder of Parties due by 2/3/2025., Discovery Motions due by 7/15/2025.) Discovery due by 8/15/2025. Signed on 1/2/25 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 12/30 2:28 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Dwayne Williams. (Ricker, Timothy)
Related: [-]
14 14 adr Designation of Neutral - Mediation and Assessment Program Mon 12/30 12:26 PM
DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL naming David Vogel(Ericsson, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/23 2:54 PM
Amended ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint on behalf of EnerSys Delaware Inc..(Ericsson, Shelley)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/23 12:20 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint on behalf of EnerSys Delaware Inc..(Attorney Shelley Irene Ericsson added to party )(Ericsson, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/10 2:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against EnerSys Delaware Inc. filed by Timothy Ricker on behalf of Dwayne Williams.(Ricker, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/10 2:16 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Adam P. Pihana on behalf of Dwayne Williams (Attorney Adam P. Pihana added to party Dwayne Williams(pty:pla))(Pihana, Adam)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Tue 12/10 1:45 PM
ORDER granting8 motion to substitute party. EnerSys Delaware Inc. added. EnerSys Energy Products Inc. terminated. Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint substituting the correct Defendant. Signed on 12/10/2024 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Rotellini, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
8 8 3 pgs motion Substitute Party Thu 11/21 12:44 PM
MOTION to substitute party filed by Timothy Ricker on behalf of Dwayne Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/5/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Ricker, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, November 15, 2024
notice Notice of Filing Fri 11/15 8:31 AM
Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/13 1:51 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Madeline Nebel on behalf of EnerSys Energy Products Inc. (Attorney Madeline Nebel added to party EnerSys Energy Products Inc.(pty:dft))(Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
6 6 order Rule 16 Notice Tue 11/12 4:09 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/30/2024. Rule 26 conference due by 12/12/2024. Signed on 11/12/24 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Tue 11/12 2:15 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Shelley Irene Ericsson on behalf of Defendant EnerSys Energy Products Inc..(Ericsson, Shelley)
Related: [-]
4 4 22 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/12 2:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, on behalf of EnerSys Energy Products Inc..(Attorney Shelley Irene Ericsson added to party EnerSys Energy Products Inc.(pty:dft))(Ericsson, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Fri 11/01 8:26 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Dwayne Williams. EnerSys Energy Products Inc. served on 10/22/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Ricker, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
service Summons Issued Fri 10/18 12:42 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to EnerSys Energy Products Inc.. Summons emailed to Plaintiff's Counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Wed 10/16 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/15 5:03 PM
COMPLAINT against EnerSys Energy Products Inc. f/k/a Northstar Battery Company, LLC filed by Timothy Ricker on behalf of Dwayne Williams. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9250935. Service due by 1/13/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Ricker, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet