Washington Western District Court
Judge:Grady J Leupold
Case #: 2:24-cv-01683
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 3:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Vyacheslav Smyrnov
Defendant
Virtual Systems LLC
Plaintiff
Dish Network LLC
Represented By
Timothy M. Frank
Hagan Noll & Boyle LLC
contact info
Joseph H Boyle
Hagan Noll & Boyle LLC
contact info
Stephen M Ferguson
Hagan Noll & Boyle LLC
contact info
Gregory S. Latendresse
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 10, 2025
10 10 3 pgs misc Status Report Fri 01/10 3:18 PM
STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS by Plaintiff Dish Network LLC(Latendresse, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Friday, October 18, 2024
9 9 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/18 9:44 AM
ORDER re5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorneys Timothy M. Frank,Joseph H Boyle,Stephen M Ferguson for Dish Network LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
8 8 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Fri 10/18 8:15 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (AVC) (Main Document 8 replaced to include exhibit on 10/18/2024) (AVC)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 10/18 8:14 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants(AVC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 10/18 8:03 AM
Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
6 6 1 pgs misc Memorandum Wed 10/16 3:23 PM
MEMORANDUM Copyright Report by Plaintiff Dish Network LLC(Latendresse, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Copyright Report
5 5 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/16 12:48 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen M. Ferguson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Dish Network LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8675093 (Latendresse, Gregory)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/16 12:45 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph H. Boyle FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Dish Network LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8675071 (Latendresse, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/16 12:42 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy M. Frank FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Dish Network LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8675042 (Latendresse, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
2 2 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 10/15 4:42 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Echostar Corporation, Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Corporate Parent DISH DBS Corporation, Corporate Parent DISH Orbital Corporation for Dish Network LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Dish Network LLC. (Latendresse, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/15 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Dish Network LLC Related [+] filed by Dish Network LLC.(Latendresse, Gregory)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8673506
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 16 pgs Exhibit Registered Works,
Att: 3 Exhibit Unregistered Works,
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit Pirate Services,
Att: 5 Summons Virtual Systems, LLC,
Att: 6 Summons Vyacheslav Smyrnov