California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-08893
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 3:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Ann Notthoff
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Effie Turnbull-Sanders
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Cassidy Teufel
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Meagan Harmon
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Mike Wilson
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Roberto Uranga
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Catherine Rice
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Paloma Aguirre
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Gretchen Newsom
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Susan Lowenberg
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Kate Huckelbridge
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Caryl Hart
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Linda Escalante
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Justin Cummings
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
California Coastal Commission
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Dayna Bochco
Represented By
Jessica Aguilar Bonitz
Caag - California Attorney General Office
contact info
David G Alderson
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Space Exploration Technologies, Corp.
Represented By
Tyler Welti
Venable LLP
contact info
Mitchell Y Mirviss
contact info
Colin B Vandell
Venable LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
64 64 misc Errata Mon 05/12 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Paloma Aguirre, Dayna Bochco, California Coastal Commission, Justin Cummings, Linda Escalante, Meagan Harmon, Caryl Hart, Kate Huckelbridge, Susan Lowenberg, Gretchen Newsom, Ann Notthoff, Catherine Rice, Cassidy Teufel, Effie Turnbull-Sanders, Roberto Uranga, Mike Wilson. correcting Reply (Motion related),62 NOTICE OF ERRATA BY DEFENDANTS REGARDING ECF DOCKET NUMBER 62 (Alderson, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
63 63 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 05/09 4:55 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 56 DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Paloma Aguirre, Dayna Bochco, California Coastal Commission, Justin Cummings, Linda Escalante, Meagan Harmon, Caryl Hart, Kate Huckelbridge, Susan Lowenberg, Gretchen Newsom, Ann Notthoff, Catherine Rice, Cassidy Teufel, Effie Turnbull-Sanders, Roberto Uranga, Mike Wilson. (Alderson, David)
Related: [-]
62 62 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 05/09 4:28 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 56 DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant California Coastal Commission. (Alderson, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
61 61 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 05/07 3:51 PM
"Redlined" version of the Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Space Exploration Technologies, Corp. re: Generic Text Only Entry, 60 (Welti, Tyler)
Related: [-]
60 60 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 05/07 8:39 AM
(In Chambers) Order by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: To assist the Court's review of the pleading challenge, no later than noon on May 8, 2025, Plaintiff shall file a "redlined" version of the Second Amended Complaint showing all additions and deletions from the First Amended Complaint (excluding exhibits).THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ko)
Related: [-]