Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-04191
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Terminated:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 16, 2024 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Prit Patel (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Noticing AUSA CR TP/SR
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/20/2024 2:06 PM EST
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
1 1 16 pgs Magistrate Judge Removal of Superseding Indictment from Northern District of Oklahoma Case number in the other District 23-CR-331-JFH as to Prit Patel (1). (fbn)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Proceedings as to Prit Patel held on 10/15/2024. Bond recommendation/set: Prit Patel (1) Government's ore tenus motion for PTD based on a serious risk of flight; is Granted. Date of Arrest or Surrender: 10/11/2024. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Pretrial Detention Hearing set for 10/21/2024 at 01:00 PM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Removal Hearing set for 10/21/2024 at 01:00 PM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Bruce Howard Lehr for Prit Patel (Digital 14:29:12) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 10/15/2024. (fbn)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bruce Howard Lehr appearing for Prit Patel. (fbn)
Related: [-]