Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Referred: Patrick M Hunt
Case #: 0:24-cv-61922
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By
Ronnie Guillen
Ronnie Guillen
contact info
Mediator
ALVIN M CAPP
900 SOUTH PINE ISLAND ROAD 410 PLANTATION
PLANTATION, FL 33324
Plaintiff
Juliana Noronha
Represented By
Jay Frances Romano
Discrimination Law Center PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 02/28 9:08 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; The Clerk shall CLOSE this case and DENY any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/27/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Wed 02/26 5:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA (Guillen, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
21 21 motion Take Deposition Fri 01/24 11:52 AM
MOTION to Take Deposition from Juliana Noronha by HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA. (Guillen, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
20 20 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Tue 12/03 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added ALVIN M CAPP as Mediator. (Guillen, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 12/02 2:56 PM
Set/Reset Hearings Calendar Call set for 12/5/2025 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. per DE18 (cbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
19 19 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 11/22 2:46 PM
GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 11/20 9:32 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 12/8/2025 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 12/5/2024 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
17 17 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 11/18 5:41 PM
Proposed SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA (Guillen, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 11/18 5:14 PM
SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule by HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA (Guillen, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
15 15 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/04 3:05 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA (Guillen, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/04 2:43 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA. Attorney Ronnie Guillen added to party HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA(pty:dft). (Guillen, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 10/30 12:12 PM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
12 12 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 10/29 2:02 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Juliana Noronha. HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA served on 10/22/2024, response/answer due 11/12/2024. (Romano, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/21 10:11 AM
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/21/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 10/18 2:59 PM
Summons Issued as to HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA. (ebz)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/18 2:05 PM
NOTICE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED by Juliana Noronha (Romano, Jay)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee-405.00 Electronic Civil Case Filing Fri 10/18 1:46 PM
Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee $405.00, receipt number AFLSDC-17918045, Electronic Civil Case Filing re 7 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Romano, Jay)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Fri 10/18 1:41 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $405.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (jua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/16 4:52 PM
ORDER DEFERRING RULING ON MOTION; REQUIRING IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS re3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Filing Fee due by 10/23/2024. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/16 3:24 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Juliana Noronha (Romano, Jay)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/16 10:43 AM
NOTICE lead counsel for Plaintiff by Juliana Noronha (Romano, Jay)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/16 10:42 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Juliana Noronha. (Romano, Jay)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 10/16 10:16 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/16 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT against HAWTHORNE RESIDENTIAL PARTNERS, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA. Filing fees $ 405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Juliana Noronha.(Romano, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit RIGHT TO SUE FROM EEOC,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET