California Southern District Court
Judge:Michael M Anello
Referred: Allison H Goddard
Case #: 3:24-cv-01870
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1453 Class Action Fairness Act
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, San Diego, 24CU009015C
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 3:22 AM PDT
Defendant
CreditNinja Lending, LLC
Represented By
Scott M. Pearson
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Brandon M. Wong
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Randy Grossman
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Defendant
NinjaServicing, LLC
Represented By
Scott M. Pearson
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Brandon M. Wong
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Randy Grossman
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Silva
Represented By
Erick Kees Kuylman
Warren Terzian LLP
contact info
Thomas David Warren
Warren Terzian LLP
contact info
Dan D. Terzian
Warren Terzian LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 13 2025
NOTICE AND ORDER Providing Tentative Rulings Re: Plaintiff's 4 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/13/24.(aas)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
27 27 misc Transcript Mon 04/28 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on March 12, 2025, before Judge MICHAEL M. ANELLO. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jessica Torres Borynack. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/19/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (jtb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
26 26 appeal Transcript Designation and Ordering Form Thu 04/10 3:25 PM
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM by CreditNinja Lending, LLC, NinjaServicing, LLC for proceedings held on 3/12/2025 re22 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit,. (Wong, Brandon)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Transcript Order Thu 04/10 1:14 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 3/12/2025 by CreditNinja Lending, LLC. (Wong, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
24 24 appeal USCA Time Schedule Order Thu 04/03 2:34 PM
USCA Time Schedule Order as to22 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by CreditNinja Lending, LLC. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court, provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 4/28/2025 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 5/28/2025.) (mjw)
Related: [-]
23 23 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 04/03 2:34 PM
USCA Case Number 25-2165 for22 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by CreditNinja Lending, LLC.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Appeal Case Opening,
Att: 2 Pro Se Appeals Case Opening,
Att: 3 Ninth Circuit Appellate Mentoring Program
Thursday, March 27, 2025
22 22 appeal Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Thu 03/27 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to 20 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Motion Hearing, by CreditNinja Lending, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 605 receipt number ACASDC-19739826.) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.)(Pearson, Scott) (mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
21 21 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 03/25 10:10 AM
USCA Case Number 25-1928 for Appeal Document Filed.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition for Permission to Appeal,
Att: 2 Appellate Mentoring Program,
Att: 3 Appellate Practice Guide
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
20 20 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Wed 03/12 1:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Anello: Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2025. Court affirms its tentative ruling. The Clerk is directed to send a certified copy of this minute entry and ECF13 Tentative Rulings to the San Diego Superior Court. The Clerk is further directed to close this case. (Court Reporter/ECR Jessica Torres Borynack). (Plaintiff Attorney Dan Terzian).(Defense Attorneys Randy Grossman and Brandon Wong). (no document attached) (pdc)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/12 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Randy Grossman on behalf of CreditNinja Lending, LLC, NinjaServicing, LLC (Grossman, Randy)Attorney Randy Grossman added to party CreditNinja Lending, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Randy Grossman added to party NinjaServicing, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 01, 2025
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Sat 03/01 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in support of Motion to Remand (ECF 4) by Joseph Silva re4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Terzian, Dan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/21 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Motion to Remand by CreditNinja Lending, LLC, NinjaServicing, LLC re4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Pearson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/20 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in support of Motion to Remand (ECF 4) by Joseph Silva re4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Terzian, Dan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 01/14 11:15 AM
ORDER gGanting14 Joint Motion to Continue Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2025 11:00 AM before Judge Michael M. Anello. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/14/25. (aas)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
14 14 motion Continue Mon 01/13 8:14 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue the January 15 Hearing on the Motion to Remand (ECF 4) by Joseph Silva. (Terzian, Dan)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Tentative Order Mon 01/13 2:35 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER Providing Tentative Rulings Re: Plaintiff's4 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/13/24.(aas)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 01/13 9:08 AM
NOTICE of Change in Hearing Time Only : Plaintiff's4 MOTION to Remand to State Court is currently set for hearing on January 15, 2025 in Courtroom 3C. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Court RESETS this matter to 10:30 a.m. SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on January 13, 2025. (no document attached) (pdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
11 11 order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/10 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Change in Hearing Time Only : Plaintiff's4 MOTION to Remand to State Court is currently set for hearing on January 15, 2025 in Courtroom 3C. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Court RESETS this matter to 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on January 10, 2025.(no document attached) (kff)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 29, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Sun 12/29 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in support of Motion to Remand (ECF 4) by Joseph Silva re4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Terzian, Dan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/11 6:41 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in support of Motion to Remand by Joseph Silva re4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Terzian, Dan)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/11 12:26 PM
ORDER Granting7 Request for Oral Argument Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Michael M. Anello.. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/11/24. (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/27 12:27 PM
MOTION -- Request for Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by CreditNinja Lending, LLC, NinjaServicing, LLC. (Pearson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 respm Reply - Other Tue 11/26 10:18 AM
REPLY - Other re4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Joseph Silva. (Terzian, Dan) (aas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
5 5 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/19 12:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CreditNinja Lending, LLC, NinjaServicing, LLC.(Pearson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jack Snitkovsky
Friday, November 01, 2024
4 4 motion Remand to State Court Fri 11/01 3:57 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Joseph Silva.(Terzian, Dan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Dan Terzian,
Att: 3 Exhibit A: First Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit B: Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Remand in Young v. Renewal by Andersen, LLC
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/22 8:42 AM
ORDER Granting2 Joint Motion. CreditNinja Lending, LLC answer due 11/5/2024; NinjaServicing, LLC answer due 11/5/2024. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/22/24. (aas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
2 2 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/21 9:02 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Amended Complaint and to Set a Briefing Schedule on the Motion to Remand by CreditNinja Lending, LLC, NinjaServicing, LLC. (Pearson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 10/16 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19267654.), filed by NinjaServicing, LLC, CreditNinja Lending, LLC. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1870-MMA-AHG. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(axc1) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Appendix of State Court Documents,
Att: 3 Disclosures,
Att: 4 Proof of Service