California Southern District Court
Judge:Thomas J Whelan
Referred: Steve B Chu
Case #: 3:24-cv-01873
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983cv Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
County of San Diego
Represented By
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-15
Defendant
Sean Thompson
Represented By
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Thompson
Represented By
Timothy A. Scott
Mckenzie Scott PC
contact info
Marcus S. Bourassa
Mckenzie Scott PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 03/12 12:01 PM
ORDER Granting11 Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 3/12/2025. (exs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
11 11 motion Protective Order Tue 03/11 1:25 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by County of San Diego, Sean Thompson.(Inman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
10 10 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/29 5:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: Status Conference set for 5/22/2025 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 12/17/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/26/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2026 10:30 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 1/29/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference Wed 01/29 2:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference held on 1/29/2025. Court to issue scheduling order. (Plaintiff Attorney Timothy A. Scott). (Defendant Attorney Steven P. Inman). (no document attached) (cdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
8 8 misc Withdrawal of Document Tue 12/03 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Richard Thompson re7 Joint Discovery Plan filed by Richard Thompson . (Bourassa, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
7 7 notice Joint Discovery Plan Mon 12/02 4:08 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Richard Thompson (Bourassa, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
6 6 6 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Wed 11/20 12:17 PM
Notice and Order For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/22/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 11/20/2024.(dim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/14 1:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by County of San Diego, Sean Thompson.(Inman, Steven)Attorney Steven Paul Inman, II added to party County of San Diego(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Paul Inman, II added to party Sean Thompson(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/05 2:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Thompson. Sean Thompson served. (Scott, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/05 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Thompson. County of San Diego served. (Scott, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/16 10:46 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/16 10:28 AM
COMPLAINT against County of San Diego, Sean Thompson ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19268808.), filed by Richard Thompson. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1873-W-SBC. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu are assigned to the case. (Bourassa, Marcus)(axc1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet