Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Paul G Byron
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:24-cv-01861
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Affordable Solar Roof & Air, LLC
Represented By
Klarika Jean Caplano
Coats Schmidt, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dawn Demas Summey
Represented By
Avi Robert Kaufman
Kaufman P.A.
contact info
Rachel Elizabeth Kaufman
Kaufman P.A.
contact info
Third Party Defendant
Clean Energy Experts LLC
1601 N Sepulveda Blvd #227
Manhattan Beach, CA 90266
Third Party Plaintiff
Affordable Solar Roof & Air, LLC
Represented By
Klarika Jean Caplano
Coats Schmidt, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
32 32 order Order Tue 04/01 4:33 PM
ENDORSED ORDER striking 31 Third-Party Complaint for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 14. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/1/2025. (ND)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
31 31 cmp Third Party Complaint Fri 03/28 6:32 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Clean Energy Experts LLC filed by Affordable Solar Roof & Air, LLC.(Caplano, Klarika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Initial Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Answer
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Tue 03/11 2:57 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on June 9, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. before David E. Jones.(Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/25 3:08 PM
ORDER. This cause is before the Court on the Case Management Report filed by the parties (Doc. 27 ). The report indicates that the parties have not yet agreed on a mediator. Therefore, the parties are directed to confer and advise the Court on the selection of a mediator and the mediation date within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/25/2025. (KM)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 02/25 3:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 3/28/2025. Discovery due by 4/6/2026. Dispositive motions due by 5/4/2026. Pretrial statement due by 8/17/2026. All other motions due by 8/24/2026. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/2/2026. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/2/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2026 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Jury Trial set for the trial term commencing on 10/5/2026 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/13/2026. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/25/2025. (KM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
27 27 misc Case Management Report Fri 02/21 11:26 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
26 26 order Order to Strike Thu 02/20 8:29 AM
ENDORSED ORDER to strike re: 25 Case Management Report. The parties are directed to confer and file a new Case Management Report with requested dates within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/20/2025. (KM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
25 25 misc Case Management Report Wed 02/19 4:20 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Caplano, Klarika)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 02/19 3:47 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Affordable Solar Roof & Air, LLC. (Caplano, Klarika)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
22 22 minutes Case Management Conference Wed 02/12 11:15 AM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: IDEAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 2/12/2025. (Digital / Zoom) (TNP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing - Reschedule Time Only Thu 02/06 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The IDEAL Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 2/12/2025 is rescheduled. New hearing time: IDEAL Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2025 at 11:00 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. An updated Zoom link will be sent to counsel via email. (TNP)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 02/06 9:10 AM
NOTICE of hearing: IDEAL Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2025 at 10:00 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. A Zoom link will be sent to counsel via email. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
19 19 respoth Response Thu 01/30 11:47 AM
RESPONSE re16 Order by Dawn Demas Summey. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of appearance Wed 01/29 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Klarika Jean Caplano on behalf of Affordable Solar Roof & Air, LLC (Caplano, Klarika)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/29 11:53 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, by Affordable Solar Roof & Air, LLC.(Caplano, Klarika)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order Mon 01/27 2:11 PM
ORDER. A review of this case finds that the complaint in this action was filed October 16, 2024, and it appears service was executed on the defendant on or about October 22, 2024. Defendant has failed respond to the complaint. Plaintiff has not applied for entry of default, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) within the time provided in Local Rule 1.10(b), or as further extended by the Court. Therefore, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why the complaint against the defendant should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 3.10, M.D. Fla. Failure to respond to this order may result in dismissal of the defendant without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/27/2025. (KM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
15 15 service Summons returned executed Tue 01/21 10:28 AM
RETURN of service executed on 10/22/2024 by Dawn Demas Summey as to Affordable Solar Roof & Air, LLC. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order to show cause Thu 01/16 2:30 PM
ORDER to show cause as to Dawn Demas Summey. The Complaint in this action was filed on October 16, 2024. Plaintiff has failed to effect proper service on the Defendant within the 90 days allowed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or as further extended by the Court. Therefore, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why the Complaint against the Defendant should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m). Failure to respond to this Order may result in dismissal of this case as to said Defendant(s) without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/16/2025. (KM)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
13 13 order Order Mon 11/25 10:38 AM
ENDORSED ORDER discharging 9 Order to show cause. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/25/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
12 12 respoth Response Fri 11/22 9:41 AM
RESPONSE re9 Order to show cause by Dawn Demas Summey. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 11/08 3:30 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dawn Demas Summey. Related case(s): No (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/08 3:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dawn Demas Summey. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order to show cause Fri 11/08 3:09 PM
ORDER to show cause as to Dawn Demas Summey. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Order of October 17, 2024 directing counsel to file a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions and a Certificate of Interested Persons. Therefore, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the case without further notice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/8/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Mon 10/21 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (TNP)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Standing Order Mon 10/21 3:55 PM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
6 6 order Order Thu 10/17 9:28 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. The parties are DIRECTED to confer regarding deadlines pertinent to a motion for class certification and advise the Court of agreeable deadlines in their case management report. The deadlines should include a deadline for (1) disclosure of expert reports - class action, plaintiff and defendant; (2) discovery - class action; (3) motion for class certification; (4) response to motion for class certification; and (5) reply to motion for class certification Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/17/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Interested Persons Order Thu 10/17 9:28 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/17/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 10/17 8:33 AM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELA)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Thu 10/17 8:32 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Affordable Solar Roof & Air, LLC. (ELA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/16 3:14 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-01861-PGB-DCI. (JOS)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/16 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Affordable Solar Roof & Air, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22616667) filed by Dawn Demas Summey.(Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons