Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Mark E Walker
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 1:24-cv-00181
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Case in other court:Alachua County, 2024-CA-2973
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
MUSE LAMAR DQUINCY
Represented By
EDWARD FRANCIS GAGAIN, III
Gagain Scaz Group Pllc - Tampa Fl
contact info
Defendant
HIGHWAY TRANSPORT CHEMICAL LLC
Represented By
EDWARD FRANCIS GAGAIN, III
Gagain Scaz Group Pllc - Tampa Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD DEPRIEST
Represented By
WILLIAM THEO ALLEN
Allen Law Firm Pa - Gainesville Fl
contact info
ABRAHAM C BANKS
Allen Law Firm - Ocala Fl
contact info
ANTHONY JAMES LIVINGSTON
Allen Law Firm - Gainesville Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 05/13 9:07 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:10 ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Report due on or before Monday, 5/12/2025. (***None filed to date.***) (kdm)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/13 9:09 PM
RESet Deadline per4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 6/12/2025 . (kdm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/05 3:33 PM
ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT re 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. (Joint Status Report due on or before Monday, 5/12/2025 and every thirty days thereafter while discovery is ongoing). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/5/2025. (kdm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
3 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference, please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (kdm)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE AND PETITION FOR REMOVAL by Highway Transport Chemical, LLC, Muse Lamar DQunicy from Alachua County, case number 2024-CA-2973. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9100152.), filed by Highway Transport Chemical, LLC, Muse Lamar DQunicy. (GAGAIN, EDWARD) Modified on 10/16/2024 to edit title and text (kdm).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial ,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit