Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:David M Lawson
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:24-cv-12742
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Terminated:Nov 20, 2024
Case in other court:38th Circuit Court, County of Monroe, 23-146263-NO
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC
Represented By
John B. Pinney
Bricker Graydon LLP
contact info
Defendant
King & Prince Seafood Corporation
Represented By
Mark W. Sandretto
Eastman & Smith
contact info
Stuart J. Goldberg
Eastman & Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
Shauna Johnsey
Represented By
Jennifer G. Damico
Fieger Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
12 12 notice Remand* Wed 11/20 12:14 PM
NOTICE remanding case to MONROE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (TTho)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Remanding Case Wed 11/20 12:12 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE to State Court. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (TTho)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Mon 11/18 8:55 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING REMAND OF CASE TO MICHIGAN STATE COURT by Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC (Pinney, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
9 9 order Strike Thu 11/14 10:43 AM
ORDER to Strike8 Stipulation filed by Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation Fri 10/25 4:28 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Remand of Case to Michigan State Court by Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC (Pinney, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Fri 10/25 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Pinney on behalf of Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC. (Pinney, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/25 9:41 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses (Answer to First Amended Complaint) by King & Prince Seafood Corporation. (Goldberg, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
5 5 notice Notice - Other Wed 10/23 1:24 PM
NOTICE by King & Prince Seafood Corporation re3 Order Submission of Information Regarding Removal in Response to Standing Order (Goldberg, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
4 4 notice Appearance Thu 10/17 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Sandretto on behalf of King & Prince Seafood Corporation. (Sandretto, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 10/17 12:36 PM
STANDING ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF INFORMATION REGARDING1 Notice of Removal. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 10/16 2:54 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by King & Prince Seafood Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Nissui USA, Other Affiliate Nissui Corporation for King & Prince Seafood Corporation. (Goldberg, Stuart)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Wed 10/16 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by King & Prince Seafood Corporation from 38th Circuit Court, Monroe County, case number 23-146263-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9979093 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Goldberg, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B - Affidavit of James E. Roberts,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 10/16 3:59 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SHic)
Related: [-]