Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Referred: Bill Davis
Case #: 4:24-cv-00923
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
15 15 order Judgment Wed 04/30 1:34 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the decision of theCommissioner is REVERSED and REMANDED for further proceedings. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/30/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to Agency Wed 04/30 1:31 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Reverse and Remand. IT IS ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and REMANDED for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/30/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 motion Remand to Agency Tue 04/29 10:32 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration by Commissioner, SSA.(Kemp, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order
Monday, April 14, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 04/14 10:00 AM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that the motion to extend time, Dkt.11 , is GRANTED. The Commissioner's brief is due May 13, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 4/14/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 04/11 10:32 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Commissioner, SSA.(Kemp, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order
Friday, February 14, 2025
10 10 appeal Appellants Brief Fri 02/14 11:57 PM
Appellant's BRIEF by Nancy Anne Richardson. (Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 01/08 12:29 PM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that: 1) the motion to extend time, Dkt.8 , is GRANTED; and 2) the plaintiff's brief is due February 14, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 1/8/2025. (xl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 01/07 2:04 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Nancy Anne Richardson.(Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 16, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order Directing Filing of Brief Mon 12/16 2:07 PM
ORDER DIRECTING BRIEFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 12/16/2024. (xl)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/13 11:35 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Commissioner, SSA.(Kemp, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s) 001 Certification Page.pdf,
Att: 2 Additional Attachment(s) 002 Court Transcript Index.pdf,
Att: 3 Additional Attachment(s) 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable.pdf,
Att: 4 Additional Attachment(s) 004 Payment Documents and Decisions.pdf,
Att: 5 Additional Attachment(s) 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices.pdf,
Att: 6 Additional Attachment(s) 006 Non Disability Related Development.pdf,
Att: 7 Additional Attachment(s) 007 Disability Related Development.pdf,
Att: 8 Additional Attachment(s) 008 Medical Records.pdf
misc SSA Administrative Record Mon 12/16 8:30 AM
Statistical correction. (mcg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 10/18 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kerry Jean Kemp on behalf of Commissioner, SSA (Kemp, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/17 3:19 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 10/17/2024. (xl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/16 2:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nancy Anne Richardson.(Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/16 2:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of SSA (Complaint NEF sent to SSA OGC and to EDTX USAO.), filed by Nancy Anne Richardson.(Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/16 3:51 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. (xl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Wed 10/16 3:52 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (xl)
Related: [-]