Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jerry W Blackwell
Case #: 0:24-cv-03939
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:0405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Interested Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable

GPO Mar 12 2025
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) 18. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 3/12/2025. (DCC)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 03/12 11:04 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) 18 . (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 3/12/2025. (DCC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
22 22 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Tue 03/11 9:09 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re18 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Teresa McCullar.(Konoski, Bryan)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 03/11 9:08 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re18 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Teresa McCullar.(Konoski, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate,
Att: 2 Certificate of Conferral,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A-C
20 20 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 03/11 9:02 AM
Declaration of Bryan Konoski in Support of18 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Teresa McCullar.(Konoski, Bryan)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Certificate of Service Tue 03/11 9:00 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Teresa McCullar re18 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Konoski, Bryan)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Attorney Fees Tue 03/11 8:58 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Teresa McCullar. (Konoski, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
17 17 misc Letter from Clerk's Office to County District Court or Government Agency re: Remand Order Thu 01/30 12:01 PM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to Social Security Administration enclosing15 Order of Remand. cc: SSA. (ACH)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Thu 01/30 11:55 AM
JUDGMENT(ACH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
15 15 order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 01/29 11:22 AM
ORDER FOR REMAND. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is remanded, pursuant to sentence 4 of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), to the Commissioner of Social Security for supplemental hearing and further administrative action. On remand, the case will be assigned to an ALJ who will issue a new decision. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 1/29/2025. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
14 14 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 01/28 2:59 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re13 Stipulation. (Barry, Molly)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation Tue 01/28 2:57 PM
STIPULATION for Remand by Michelle King. Jointly Signed by Teresa McCullar. (Barry, Molly)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Barry on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin. (Barry, Molly)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
11 11 respm Exhibit (Motions and Related Filings) Fri 01/10 9:58 AM
EXHIBIT A-B re10 SSA Brief Plaintiff's Opening Brief re1 Complaint Plaintiff's Opening Brief filed by Teresa McCullar.(Konoski, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) B- DOT
10 10 motion Memorandum/Brief in a SSA Case Fri 01/10 9:55 AM
SSA Brief Plaintiff's Opening Brief re1 Complaint Plaintiff's Opening Brief filed by Teresa McCullar.(Konoski, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Friday, December 13, 2024
9 9 notice Notice to Attorney - SSA Case Reassigned to District Judge Fri 12/13 1:08 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. A notice to withdraw consent has been filed in this case case and is now assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell and Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-3939 JWB/DJF . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (MMG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
8 8 misc SSA Administrative Record Thu 12/12 1:33 PM
Social Security ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed electronically. (Tankard, Frank)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/12 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Tankard on behalf of Martin J. O'Malley. (Tankard, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 10/17 10:07 AM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 10/17/2024. (LNP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
5 5 notice SSA Case Assignment Form Issued Wed 10/16 4:39 PM
NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per [LINK:Local Rule 7.2] , this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota Clerks Office 300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202 Minneapolis, MN 55415 (MMG)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment - SSA Magistrate Judge Wed 10/16 4:39 PM
(Text-Ony) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster per Social Security List. Please use case number 24-cv-3939 DJF. (MMG)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/16 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Konoski on behalf of Teresa McCullar. (Konoski, Bryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP) Wed 10/16 3:28 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Teresa McCullar. (Konoski, Bryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/16 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley filed by Teresa McCullar. No summons requested. (Konoski, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet