Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mitchell S Goldberg
Case #: 2:24-cv-05479
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Cause42:1973gg-2 Nat'l. Voter Registration Act of 1993 (NVRA)
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
JAMES ALLEN
Represented By
Alessandra Mungioli
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
J. MANLY PARKS
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
RICHARD WOMACK
Represented By
Alessandra Mungioli
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
J. MANLY PARKS
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
MONICA TAYLOR
Represented By
Alessandra Mungioli
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
J. MANLY PARKS
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
ELAINE SCHAEFER
Represented By
Alessandra Mungioli
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
J. MANLY PARKS
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
CHRISTINE REUTHER
Represented By
Alessandra Mungioli
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
J. MANLY PARKS
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
KEVIN MADDEN
Represented By
Alessandra Mungioli
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
J. MANLY PARKS
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
DELAWARE COUNTY COUNCIL
Represented By
Alessandra Mungioli
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
J. MANLY PARKS
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By
Alessandra Mungioli
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
J. MANLY PARKS
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
DELAWARE COUNTY
Represented By
Alessandra Mungioli
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
J. MANLY PARKS
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SCOTT EDWIN THOMAS
703 BARCLAY LANE
BROOMALL, PA 19008
Plaintiff
DARLENE SMAIL
2277 KERR ROAD
FORD CITY, PA 16226
Plaintiff
JEANNE WHITE
4402 CONGRESS COURT
NORTH WALES, PA 19454
Plaintiff
MARTY SELKER
875 IRON BRIDGE ROAD
SIGEL, PA 15860
Plaintiff
JOY SCHWARTZ
514 LOMBARDY ROAD
DREXEL HILL, PA 19026
Plaintiff
BRIAN YANOVIAK
170 MARANATHA DRIVE
COATESVILLE, PA 19320
Plaintiff
MELANIE PATTERSON
332 FIRST AVE
BELLE VERNON, PA 15012
Plaintiff
MICHAEL MILLER
108 NORTH READING ROAD SUITE 246F
EPHRATA, PA 17522
Plaintiff
RENEE MAZER
191 PRESIDENTIAL BLVD STE 419
BALA CYNWYD, PA 19004
Plaintiff
JON MARIETTA
348 BUNKER HILL ROAD
NEW SALEM, PA 15468
Plaintiff
ROBERT MANCINI
4 GUERNSEY LANE
MEDIA, PA 19063
Plaintiff
ERIK KOCHER
836 CONCORD RD #2
GLEN MILLS, PA 19342
Plaintiff
CARRIS J. KOCHER
836 CONCORD ROAD #2
GLEN MILLS, PA 19342
Plaintiff
LEAH HOOPES
241 SULKY WAY
CHADDS FORD, PA 19317
Plaintiff
CARRIE HAHN
994 INDIAN RUN ROAD
VOLANT, PA 16156
Plaintiff
GENO GALLO
232 NORTH SEVENTH STREET
CONNELLSVILLE, PA 15425
Plaintiff
FELICE FEIN
806 STILLWOOD LANE
WESTCHESTER, PA 19380
Plaintiff
ASHLEY DUFF
1957 ROUTE 481
MONONGAHELA, PA 15063
Plaintiff
SUSANNA DEJEET
310 JACLYN COURT
DELMONT, PA 15626
Plaintiff
SEAN PATRICK CONNOLLY
124 KAITLIN DRIVE
COLLEGEVILLE, PA 19426
Plaintiff
GREGORY STENSTROM
1541 FARMERS LANE
GLEN MILLS, PA 19342
Plaintiff
EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ
514 LOMBARDY ROAD
DREXEL HILL, PA 19026
Plaintiff
PAUL RUMLEY
1308 CROZER PLACE
SPRINGFIELD, PA 19064
Plaintiff
DR. ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN
PHD, CANDIDATE FOR UNITED STATES CONGRESS 117 ABBEY TERRACE
DREXEL HILL, PA 19026
Plaintiff
JOHN P. CHILD
308 ROCKINGHAM ROAD
BRYN MAWR, PA 19010
Plaintiff
KATHRYN BUCKLEY
CANDIDATE OF PENNSYLVANIA STATE REPRESENTATIVE 1070 ANTLER DRIVE
GLEN MILLS, PA 19342

GPO Oct 31 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/31/24. 10/31/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE'S WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS. (va)
GPO Oct 31 2024
ORDER THAT THE PETITION AND AMENDED EMERGENCY PETITION ARE DENIED AND DISMISSED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/31/24. 10/31/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE'S WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS. (va)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 18, 2024
30 30 appeal USCA Order Mon 11/18 11:21 AM
ORDER of USCA as to25 Notice of Appeal filed by EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, KATHRYN BUCKLEY, PAUL RUMLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, GREGORY STENSTROM,26 Notice of Appeal, filed by EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, KATHRYN BUCKLEY, PAUL RUMLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, GREGORY STENSTROM. THE AOBVE CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY PROSECUTE INSOFAR AS APPELLANTS FAILED TO PAY THE REQUISITE FEE AS DIRECTED. ETC. (dt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
misc Remark Thu 11/07 7:44 AM
PAPER #29 MAILED TO PRO'S (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 11/06 1:31 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PETITIONERS PRO SE MOTIONS TO EXPEDITE (ECF NOS. 2, 20), MOTION TO AMEND EMERGENCY PETITION FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AS COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 10), AND MOTION FOR EXPEDITED REVIEW (ECF NO. 12), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/6/2024.11/6/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE'S WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS. (sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
28 28 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Fri 11/01 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re25 Notice of Appeal filed by EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, KATHRYN BUCKLEY, PAUL RUMLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, GREGORY STENSTROM,26 Notice of Appeal, filed by EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, KATHRYN BUCKLEY, PAUL RUMLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, GREGORY STENSTROM. USCA Case Number 24-3060 (mas)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Statement Fri 11/01 12:47 PM
Rule 1925(b) Statement of Matters Complained of on Appeal and Request for Emergency Relief filed by KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, PAUL RUMLEY, EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, GREGORY STENSTROM. Certificate of Service.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
26 26 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 11/01 12:41 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to24 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion),23 Memorandum and/or Opinion by KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, PAUL RUMLEY, EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, GREGORY STENSTROM. No fee paid. No IFP filed.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
25 25 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 11/01 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, PAUL RUMLEY, EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, GREGORY STENSTROM. NO IFP, NO FEE PAID.(sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LETTER FROM USCA
misc Remark Fri 11/01 9:40 AM
COPIES OF MEMO AND ORDER NOS. 23 & 24 MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES ON 11/1/2024. (ahf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Thu 10/31 5:34 PM
ORDER THAT THE PETITION AND AMENDED EMERGENCY PETITION ARE DENIED AND DISMISSED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/31/24. 10/31/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE'S WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS. (va)
Related: [-]
23 23 11 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Thu 10/31 5:32 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/31/24. 10/31/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE'S WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS. (va)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 10/31 1:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERGin Courtroom 17-A Motion Hearing held on 24-5479 re12 MOTION to Expedite filed by EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, KEVIN MADDEN, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, KATHRYN BUCKLEY, PAUL RUMLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, GREGORY STENSTROM (sg)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Praecipe/Request Thu 10/31 8:42 AM
PRAECIPE TO ENTER JUDICIAL NOTICE by KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, PAUL RUMLEY, EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, GREGORY STENSTROM. (sg)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Expedite Thu 10/31 8:39 AM
MOTION TO EXPEDITE CONSIDERATION OF PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, filed by KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, SEAN PATRICK CONNOLLY, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, SUSANNA DEJEET, ASHLEY DUFF, FELICE FEIN, GENO GALLO, CARRIE HAHN, LEAH HOOPES, CARRIS J. KOCHER, ERIK KOCHER, ROBERT MANCINI, JON MARIETTA, RENEE MAZER, MICHAEL MILLER, MELANIE PATTERSON, PAUL RUMLEY, EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, JOY SCHWARTZ, MARTY SELKER, DARLENE SMAIL, GREGORY STENSTROM, SCOTT EDWIN THOMAS, JEANNE WHITE, BRIAN YANOVIAK..(sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COVER LETTER
19 19 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 8:37 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, against JAMES ALLEN, DELAWARE COUNTY, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY COUNCIL, KEVIN MADDEN, CHRISTINE REUTHER, ELAINE SCHAEFER, MONICA TAYLOR, RICHARD WOMACK, filed by EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, JOHN P. CHILD, GREGORY STENSTROM, PAUL RUMLEY, KATHRYN BUCKLEY, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, ASHLEY DUFF, FELICE FEIN, JOY SCHWARTZ, GENO GALLO, DARLENE SMAIL, SCOTT EDWIN THOMAS, LEAH HOOPES, SEAN PATRICK CONNOLLY, MARTY SELKER, JEANNE WHITE, CARRIE HAHN, MICHAEL MILLER, ROBERT MANCINI, ERIK KOCHER, SUSANNA DEJEET, MELANIE PATTERSON, BRIAN YANOVIAK, RENEE MAZER, JON MARIETTA, CARRIS J. KOCHER.(sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EXHIBIT A WRIT OF MANDAMUS,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Mancini et al v Delware County et al,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Child et al v Delaware County et al,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Miller v Lancaster County et al,
Att: 5 EXHIBIT LIST 30OCT2024 R1,
Att: 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATORY JUDGMENT 30OCT2024 R1,
Att: 7 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DECLARATORY JUDGMENT 30OCT2024 R1,
Att: 8 COVER SHEET
misc Remark Thu 10/31 7:56 AM
PAPER #18 MAILED TO PRO SE'S (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/30 2:55 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PETITIONERS AMENDED EMERGENCY PETITION (ECF NO. 11), AND MOTION FOR EXPEDITED REVIEW (ECF NO. 12), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT A HEARING ON THESE MATTERS SHALL TAKE PLACE BEFORE THE UNDERSIGNED ON THURSDAY, OCTOBER 31, 2024 BEGINNING AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 17A OF THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL BE PREPARED TO ADDRESS WHETHER THIS COURT HAS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION TO HEAR THIS CASE, AND WHETHER THE PETITIONERS HAVE STANDING TO MAINTAIN THIS ACTION. THE PARTIES SHALL ALSO BE PREPARED TO PRESENT ANY AND ALL WITNESSES, AND/OR RELEVANT EVIDENCE SUPPORTING THEIR RESPECTIVE CLAIMS, POSITIONS AND ARGUMENTS AT THAT TIME. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/30/2024. 10/30/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE'S WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS.(sg)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Status Conference Wed 10/30 11:34 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Status Conference held on 10/28/2024. Court Reporter: BOBBIE SHANFELDER. (sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/29 8:07 AM
Pro Se Plaintiff's KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, PAUL RUMLEY, EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, GREGORY STENSTROM Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Petition for Declaratory Judgment, Certification of Service.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COVER SHEET
Monday, October 28, 2024
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/29 8:02 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Laura Lens re: served Legal Papers upon Anthony Oriente by Personal on 10/28/24(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COVER SHEET
14 14 misc Praecipe/Request Tue 10/29 7:57 AM
Praecipe for Writ of Mandamus by KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, PAUL RUMLEY, GREGORY STENSTROM, Certification of Service.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 3 cover sheet
13 13 respoth Response Mon 10/28 11:27 PM
Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Amended Emergency Petition (ECF No. 11) by JAMES ALLEN, DELAWARE COUNTY, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY COUNCIL, KEVIN MADDEN, CHRISTINE REUTHER, ELAINE SCHAEFER, MONICA TAYLOR, RICHARD WOMACK. (Mungioli, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - State Court Order Denying Relief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Amended Petition,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service
12 12 motion Expedite Mon 10/28 10:46 AM
MOTION OF PLAINTIFF'S KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, KEVIN MADDEN, PAUL RUMLEY, EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, GREGORY STENSTROM FOR EXPEDITED REVIEW, CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 cover sheet
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/28 10:43 AM
AMENDED EMERGENCY PETITION BY PLAINTIFF'S GREGORY STENSTROM, PAUL RUMLEY, EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN Against all Defendants, Certification of Service.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED ORDER,
Att: 2 Cover Page
10 10 motion Amend/Correct Mon 10/28 10:38 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, PAUL RUMLEY, EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, GREGORY STENSTROM.CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE..(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Cover Page
Friday, October 25, 2024
9 9 7 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 10/25 10:41 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re2 MOTION to Expedite filed by JAMES ALLEN, DELAWARE COUNTY, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY COUNCIL, KEVIN MADDEN, CHRISTINE REUTHER, ELAINE SCHAEFER, MONICA TAYLOR, RICHARD WOMACK.(Mungioli, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Prop'd Order Denying Motion to Expedite,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
8 8 respoth Response Fri 10/25 10:38 PM
Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Petition for Emergency Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief (ECF No. 1) by JAMES ALLEN, DELAWARE COUNTY, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY COUNCIL, KEVIN MADDEN, CHRISTINE REUTHER, ELAINE SCHAEFER, MONICA TAYLOR, RICHARD WOMACK. (Mungioli, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A- Declaration of Crystal Winterbottom,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Prop'd Order Denying Plaintiffs' Petition,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 10/25 9:47 AM
PAPERLESS NOTICE: A Status Conference (On the record) re Petition for Emergency Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief1 is scheduled for Monday, October 28, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be conducted via telephone. Parties are directed to dial in as follows: (1) Call: 888-684-8852; (2) Enter access code: 2187450#; (3) Press # to enter as a participant. (smcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/22 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alessandra Mungioli on behalf of JAMES ALLEN, DELAWARE COUNTY, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY COUNCIL, KEVIN MADDEN, CHRISTINE REUTHER, ELAINE SCHAEFER, MONICA TAYLOR, RICHARD WOMACK with Certificate of Service(Mungioli, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/22 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by J. MANLY PARKS on behalf of JAMES ALLEN, DELAWARE COUNTY, DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, DELAWARE COUNTY COUNCIL, KEVIN MADDEN, CHRISTINE REUTHER, ELAINE SCHAEFER, MONICA TAYLOR, RICHARD WOMACK with Certificate of Service(PARKS, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Monday, October 21, 2024
4 4 misc Pro Se E-Notice Consent Form Mon 10/21 1:33 PM
Pro Se E-Notice Consent Form by JOHN P. CHILD consenting to e-notice at JOHNBUYSPROPERT@GMAIL.COM (sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
misc Remark Thu 10/17 7:45 AM
COPY OF DOC. NO. 3 W/ E-NOTICE FORMS HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
3 3 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Wed 10/16 9:12 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES EMAILED TO PRO SE. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(sg) (sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/16/2024) E-CONSENT
Friday, October 11, 2024
2 2 motion Expedite Wed 10/16 9:08 AM
MOTION to Expedite filed by KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN, PAUL RUMLEY, EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, GREGORY STENSTROM..(sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COVER LETTER
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/16 9:04 AM
Petition for Emergency Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief filed by GREGORY STENSTROM, PAUL RUMLEY, EUPHROSYNE (JOY) SCHWARTZ, KATHRYN BUCKLEY, JOHN P. CHILD, ALFEIA DE VAUGHN-GOODWIN. NO IFP, NO FEE PAID.(sg) Modified on 10/16/2024 (lisad, )
Related: [-]