California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:24-cv-08776
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Kelli C. Miller
1200 South Figueroa Street, Unit No. E1911
Los Angeles, CA 90015
Plaintiff
Circa 1200, LLC
Represented By
Chris J. Evans
Kimball Tirey And St. John LLP
contact info
Mackenzie Clara Gonzales
Kimball Tirey And St John LLP
contact info
Manisha Bajaj
Kimball Tirey And St John LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, December 06, 2024
9 9 misc Receipt Mon 12/16 12:57 PM
Receipt of Remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court on 10/29/2024. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
8 8 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Wed 10/16 2:51 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Case number: 24STUD08212. (jp)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/16 2:49 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner DENYING REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis3 . This case is REMANDED to State Court as explained in the attached statement. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 10/16 1:11 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 10/16 1:10 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 10/16 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/16 1:09 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS (Short Form) filed by Defendant Kelli C. Miller. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 10/16 1:07 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kelli C. Miller. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 10/16 1:00 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number 24STUD08212 with CONFORMED E-FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. filed by Defendant Kelli C. Miller.. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/16 1:01 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT1 filed by Defendant Kelli C. Miller. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/3/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (et)
Related: [-]