Virgin Islands District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-00056
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Oct 17, 2024 3:19 AM AST
Defendant
Omaily Sanchez Taveras (1)
Represented By
Matthew A. Campbell
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Melanie Lark Turnbull
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Everard E. Potter
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Delia L. Smith
U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/17/2024 3:54 AM AST
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Omaily Sanchez Taveras (1). (TRH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 ORDER (RM) APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Omaily Sanchez Taveras Matthew A. Campbell for Omaily Sanchez Taveras appointed. (TRH)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Omaily Sanchez Taveras (TRH)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER (RM) as to Omaily Sanchez Taveras (TRH)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release (RM) (TRH)
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller:Initial Appearance as to Omaily Sanchez Taveras held on 10/15/2024, Preliminary Examination as to Omaily Sanchez Taveras held on 10/15/2024, Detention Hearing as to Omaily Sanchez Taveras held on 10/15/2024 (Court Reporter FTR Gold Recorder.) (Interpreter Laura Garcia Hein (TIP Spanish) / Etienne Van Hissenhoven via telephone for Preliminary and Detention hearings present.) (TRH)
Related: [-]