Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:J P Stadtmueller
Case #: 2:24-cv-01328
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 4:11 AM CDT
Defendant
Our Green Lake LLC
Represented By
Michael C Lueder
Hansen Reynolds LLC
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Rogatz
Represented By
Michael C Lueder
Hansen Reynolds LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Merrit Andre Meyer
Represented By
James A Walcheske
Walcheske & Luzi LLC
contact info
Scott S Luzi
Walcheske & Luzi LLC
contact info
David M Potteiger
Walcheske & Luzi LLC
contact info
Megan Mirka
Walcheske & Luzi, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Withdrawal by Attorney Fri 04/11 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal by Megan Mirka on behalf of Merrit Andre Meyer.Attorney Megan Mirka to be termed. (Mirka, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/21 3:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/21/2025. Interim Settlement Report due by 6/13/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 7/11/2025. (cc: all counsel) (cw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Fri 01/24 11:23 AM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Our Green Lake LLC, Matthew Rogatz. (Lueder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
9 9 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 01/21 10:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Our Green Lake LLC, Matthew Rogatz. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lueder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
order Text Only Order Fri 01/17 8:35 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 1/17/2025. The Court's5 Pretrial Order requires that, within two weeks of all named parties entering their appearances, they shall submit a joint Rule 26 plan. All parties have appeared in the action. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint Rule 26 plan, or otherwise advise the Court of the status of this case, within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. (cc: all counsel) (CFZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 01/07 11:19 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Our Green Lake LLC, Matthew Rogatz. (Lueder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
notice Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate Tue 12/31 1:04 PM
NOTICE from the clerk to All Defendants requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available[LINK:here] . In addition, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1, a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (mew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/30 4:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Our Green Lake LLC, Matthew Rogatz.(Lueder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/05 9:08 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Our Green Lake LLC - Waiver sent on 10/31/2024; Matthew Rogatz - Waiver sent on 10/31/2024. (Luzi, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
5 5 13 pgs order Order Thu 10/17 1:32 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/17/2024. Judge Stadtmueller has adopted revised procedures for civil cases. Counsel for all parties should carefully review this Order and may contact chambers if they have any questions about the matters addressed herein. (cc: all counsel) (cw)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/17 10:25 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Merrit Andre Meyer. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/17 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Merrit Andre Meyer. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi, James A. Walcheske, Megan C. Mirka (Luzi, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 10/17 10:16 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Merrit Andre Meyer. (Luzi, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/17 10:16 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Our Green Lake LLC, Matthew Rogatz by Merrit Andre Meyer. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4795787)(Luzi, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons - Our Green Lake LLC,
Att: 3 Summons - Matthew Rogatz
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 10/17 10:22 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] (mew)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 10/17 12:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Our Green Lake LLC and Matthew Rogatz. (mew)
Related: [-]