Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01034
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Law Office of Sesha Kalapatapu
Represented By
Law Office of Sesha Kalapatapu
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
9 9 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Thu 04/17 1:16 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)8 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case) (Clark, Katherine
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
8 8 order Dismissing Case (Order) Wed 04/16 5:57 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 4/16/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss Case Tue 04/15 11:20 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 1:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Tue 11/05 3:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Thursday, October 24, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 10/24 4:35 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 10/24/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/18 3:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Law Office of Sesha Kalapatapu 10/18/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Thu 10/17 9:16 AM
Summons Issued on Law Office of Sesha Kalapatapu Answer Due 11/18/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/16 5:06 PM
Adversary case 24-01034 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Unauthorized Transfer by Dwayne M. Murray against Law Office of Sesha Kalapatapu. Fee Amount $350. (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover Sheet