Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01035
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express Travel
Represented By
American Express Travel
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 order Continue Hearing (Order) Mon 04/21 4:53 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Call Docket for Trial and Related Deadlines. Related [+] Signed on 4/21/25. Hearing scheduled for 9/24/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 4 Order,14 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Thursday, April 17, 2025
14 14 motion Continue Hearing Thu 04/17 4:08 PM
Consent Motion to Continue Hearing On April 23, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-] 4 Order
Att: 1 Draft Order
Thursday, December 19, 2024
13 13 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Thu 12/19 12:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)11 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant American Express Travel, Defendant American Express National Bank, Defendant American Express Company) (Hebert, Joseph
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
12 12 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Wed 12/18 2:51 PM
**DISREGARD per atty** Certificate of Service Filed by American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)11 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant American Express Travel, Defendant American Express National Bank, Defendant American Express Company) (Hebert, Joseph)Modified on 12/19/2024 (Sylvester, Kenisha)
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint (AP) Wed 12/18 2:45 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel (Hebert, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
10 10 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Tue 11/19 1:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)9 Order on Motion to Extend Time) (Hebert, Joseph
Monday, November 18, 2024
9 9 order Extend Time (Order) (AP) Tue 11/19 9:29 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 11/18/24. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant American Express Travel, Defendant American Express National Bank, Defendant American Express Company
8 8 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Mon 11/18 12:55 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)7 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant American Express Travel, Defendant American Express National Bank, Defendant American Express Company) (Hebert, Joseph
7 7 motion Extend Time (Motion) (AP) Mon 11/18 12:50 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel (Hebert, Joseph)
Related: [-]
utility Reset Answer Deadline (AP) Tue 11/19 9:31 AM
American Express Company Answer Deadline Reset for 12/18/2024; American Express National Bank Answer Deadline Reset for 12/18/2024; American Express Travel Answer Deadline Reset for 12/18/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 1:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Tue 11/05 3:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Thursday, October 24, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 10/24 4:37 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 10/24/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/18 2:20 PM
Summons Service Executed on American Express Travel 10/18/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Thu 10/17 9:23 AM
Summons Issued on American Express Travel Answer Due 11/18/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/16 5:10 PM
Adversary case 24-01035 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 by Dwayne M. Murray against American Express Travel. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover Sheet