Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Referred: Eduardo I Sanchez
Case #: 1:24-cv-24008
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Defendant
A Fashion Home (26)
Defendant
ARTMAN Home (28)
Defendant
AiQin (27)
Defendant
Airspace (1)
Defendant
All In First Store (13)
Defendant
Always Be My Girl Store (14)
Defendant
Auto Super (29)
Defendant
Autobliss Store (15)
Defendant
Awesome Selection - Youqingshu (30)
Defendant
BIGPANDA SHOP (36)
Defendant
BINYGO LIVE (38)
Defendant
BOOMIN (40)
Defendant
Beautiful Blue House (32)
Defendant
Betta C (35)
Defendant
Betta b (34)
Defendant
BingLang Shop (37)
Defendant
Blissful Abodee (39)
Defendant
Bright Light House (136)
Defendant
CM Beauty (137)
Defendant
CORNING Automotive Products (45)
Defendant
Carefully selected locally (41)
Defendant
Chunxiu spinning fine women (42)
Defendant
CieloHome (43)
Defendant
Cool Girl Storage (44)
Defendant
Cooushing (22)
Defendant
CorpRed (46)
Defendant
Da LI King (47)
Defendant
Dai yu shop (48)
Defendant
Dongxiu (49)
Defendant
ELong Bazaar (50)
Defendant
ELong Bazaar A (51)
Defendant
ELong Bazaar B (52)
Defendant
ELong Bazaar I (53)
Defendant
ELong Bazaar K (54)
Defendant
Enjoy your wonderful life (55)
Defendant
Enjoying*Life Store (16)
Defendant
FURIOON (60)
Defendant
Fair Price Mall (56)
Defendant
Ferncabag (58)
Defendant
FlyWorddd (59)
Defendant
GTAO (63)
Defendant
GTDAMAI (64)
Defendant
GUOYI Daily Necessities (65)
Defendant
GYANG (66)
Defendant
Ginger Dec (61)
Defendant
H Enjoy life (67)
Defendant
HITOP (69)
Defendant
HUHUAQUAN (72)
Defendant
HUPO KB (73)
Defendant
HUTTON LIVE Store (17)
Defendant
Hengxuan Health (68)
Defendant
Hfun Tech (23)
Defendant
Home life (138)
Defendant
Homegoods Shop (70)
Defendant
Ingenious Housewares shop (74)
Defendant
JBPS Shop Store (18)
Defendant
JD Concept Local (75)
Defendant
JHYUS Shop (76)
Defendant
JTOOYS (79)
Defendant
JUNMUMUKEJI Manufacturer Store (19)
Defendant
KAWASIMAYA Professional Sale Store (20)
Defendant
KPAN (82)
Defendant
KitchenCraft Haven (81)
Defendant
Kyoshoudo (83)
Defendant
LJJYHOME (90)
Defendant
LJN (91)
Defendant
LONGSHENGHOME (92)
Defendant
Le Puppino Pet local (84)
Defendant
LiangMeiZi (86)
Defendant
Liangpo (87)
Defendant
Linping Space (88)
Defendant
Luojiekuyesuu (93)
Defendant
Maimeirui Homeware Store (21)
Defendant
Mengling Automotive Products (94)
Defendant
Myigo (95)
Defendant
NewBee Home (96)
Defendant
Niplo-Ama (24)
Defendant
Office Craft Shop (97)
Defendant
Pearjuice (98)
Defendant
Pin An Dian (100)
Defendant
QDRT (101)
Defendant
QDUOQ (102)
Defendant
ROU SHOP (104)
Defendant
SANHOME (105)
Defendant
SHIPADO (107)
Defendant
SHOPSTORYFRANCE (141)
Defendant
SKY-00 (142)
Defendant
Seglo (106)
Defendant
ShunHiepin (108)
Defendant
Strange clouds C (110)
Defendant
Sushi Coffee (111)
Defendant
TQS (115)
Defendant
The Excellent Department (112)
Defendant
TianZhiRuiB (113)
Defendant
TongCaiShop (114)
Defendant
Usupip (25)
Defendant
Valuable shop (116)
Defendant
Volcanic bear (117)
Defendant
WTN Shop (118)
Defendant
X Treasure Trove (119)
Defendant
XFLWTO (120)
Defendant
XJShop (124)
Defendant
Xiaowen Creative (123)
Defendant
YQS Home Decor (128)
Defendant
YR toys (129)
Defendant
Yiyuanxin (127)
Defendant
ZAOMU SHOP (130)
Defendant
ZHAOXX (132)
Defendant
ZHONG HUISHAN (134)
Defendant
ZKJDSW (135)
Defendant
ban yarun (31)
Defendant
betta (33)
Defendant
fenghui commerce (57)
Defendant
green water (62)
Defendant
huangqq (71)
Defendant
jingshengqi (77)
Defendant
jiukun (78)
Defendant
ke yuan zhong yue (80)
Defendant
liang King (85)
Defendant
little bird home s (89)
Defendant
mytlp (139)
Defendant
nvjiaoezimei (140)
Defendant
pengg (99)
Defendant
renquandianpu (103)
Defendant
smlllle (109)
Defendant
wuhaiyuelian (143)
Defendant
wuyishan513 (144)
Defendant
xguoguo (121)
Defendant
xianqishop (122)
Defendant
xingtai (145)
Defendant
xionghongji8542 (146)
Defendant
xuchengyan5620 (147)
Defendant
yangguangmeigui (125)
Defendant
yezishangdian (126)
Defendant
zhangshang (131)
Defendant
zhihangerdian (133)
Plaintiff
Purple Innovation, LLC
Represented By
Leigh Benjamin Salomon
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 27 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction. Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 11/27/2024. See attached document for full details. (ed01)
GPO Dec 03 2024
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Granting 12 Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Preliminary Injunction. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Saturday, April 26, 2025
58 58 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Sat 04/26 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 37 (BingLang Shop) by Purple Innovation, LLC (Salomon, Leigh)
Related: [-]