Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah L Boardman
Case #: 8:24-cv-03020
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, C-15-CV-24-005002
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Sandy Spring Bank, Inc.
Represented By
Jill Schultz Distler
Jackson Lewis P.C
contact info
Justin T. Liberatore
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Emmett F McGee, Jr
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dawn Eberhardt
Represented By
Reuben W. Wolfson
Smithey Law Group LLC
contact info
Benjamin S. Barlow
Smithey Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
19 19 order Order Fri 03/07 3:34 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving18 stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 3/7/2025. (lmys, Chambers)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/07 3:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Sandy Spring Bank, Inc.(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
17 17 order Settlement Order Tue 02/11 3:53 PM
SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 2/11/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 02/11 3:22 PM
Settlement Conference held on 2/11/2025 before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
15 15 3 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Wed 01/08 4:16 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 1/8/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 12/16 1:59 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi for Settlement. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/16/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
13 13 order Order Staying Case Fri 12/13 4:42 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER STAYING CASE pending settlement conference. A status report is due one week after the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/13/2024. (lmys, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
12 12 misc Status Report Mon 11/25 2:38 PM
STATUS REPORT (INITIAL JOINT) by Sandy Spring Bank, Inc.(Liberatore, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/05 2:07 PM
ORDER re: Informal Discovery Dispute procedure. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/5/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/05 2:06 PM
ORDER Scheduling Conference Call for December 4, 2024 at 11 a.m.. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/5/2024.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
Monday, October 28, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/28 3:51 PM
NOTICE by Sandy Spring Bank, Inc. re3 Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions (McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Mon 10/28 3:42 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sandy Spring Bank, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sandy Spring Bancorp. Inc., Party with Financial Interest Travelers Insurance Company, Bond and Specialty Insurance for Sandy Spring Bank, Inc..(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
7 7 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 10/24 6:54 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dawn Eberhardt (Barlow, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/24 10:50 AM
DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to2 Complaint BY DAWN EBERHARDT by Sandy Spring Bank, Inc..(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Schultz Distler on behalf of Sandy Spring Bank, Inc. (Distler, Jill)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin T. Liberatore on behalf of Sandy Spring Bank, Inc. (Liberatore, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
3 3 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Mon 10/21 3:59 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Mon 10/21 4:00 PM
Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/28/2024 (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 10/21 3:57 PM
LOWER COURT COMPLAINT against Sandy Spring Bank, Inc., filed by Dawn Eberhardt(slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Lower Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Lower Court Docket Sheet
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 10/17 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number C-15-CV-24-005002. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11555152), filed by Sandy Spring Bank.(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - 2024.09.18 Service Package on Defendant,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Montgomery County Circuit Court Case Details Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Complaint Petition and Jury Demand,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Case Information Report Filed,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Request to Issue Summons,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Notice of New Case Number - Wolfson Reuben W,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Notice of New Case Number - Barlow Benjamin Stover,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Notice of New Case Number - Sandy Spring Bank,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Writ of Summons New Case Sandy Spring Bank,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Scheduling Order CC-DC 079 CS Cover Sheet Circuit Court Version CASE PLANS Barlow Benjamin Stover,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Scheduling Order CC-DC 079 CS Cover Sheet Circuit Court Version CASE PLANS Wolfson Reuben W,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - Scheduling Order CC-DC 079 CS Cover Sheet Circuit Court Version CASE PLANS Sandy Spring Bank,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - TRACK 3 SCHEDULING ORDER - Barlow Benjamin Stover,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 - TRACK 3 SCHEDULING ORDER - Sandy Spring Bank Inc,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 - TRACK 3 ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Barlow Benjamin Stover,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 - TRACK 3 ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Wolfson Reuben W,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 - TRACK 3 ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Sandy Spring Bank, Inc.,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 - Notice of Scheduling Hearing & Order of Court - Barlow, Benjamin Stover,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 - Notice of Scheduling Hearing & Order of Court - Wolfson Reuben W,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20 - Notice of Scheduling Hearing & Order of Court - Sandy Spring Bank,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21 - Return of Service - 30 Day Summons Served - wso Mr McGee via email,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22 - Attorney Appearance (EFM)
utility Remark - State Court Docs Mon 10/21 3:59 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (2) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]